TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND et al v. BRITE-PAINTING & DECORATING CO., INC.
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711, TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND, TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 VACATION FUND, TRUSTEES OF PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND and INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 VACATION FUND
Defendant: BRITE-PAINTING & DECORATING CO., INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv16808
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Edward S Kiel
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Brite-Painting & Decorationg Co., Inc for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (bt, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Default by All Plaintiffs against Brite-Painting & Decorating Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of W. Daniel Feehan, Esquire)(FEEHAN, W.)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE, TRUSTEES OF PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711, TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 VACATION FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND, TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 VACATION FUND. BRITE-PAINTING & DECORATING CO., INC. served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (FEEHAN, W.)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BRITE-PAINTING & DECORATING CO., INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (JB, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 VACATION FUND, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE, TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND, TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 VACATION FUND, TRUSTEES OF PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE. (FEEHAN, W.)
August 16, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (jr)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN J. BUSHINSKY on behalf of INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 VACATION FUND, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE, TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND, TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 VACATION FUND, TRUSTEES OF PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE (BUSHINSKY, STEVEN)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BRITE-PAINTING & DECORATING CO., INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9900049), filed by PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE, TRUSTEES OF PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711, TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 VACATION FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND, TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 VACATION FUND. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(FEEHAN, W.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND et al v. BRITE-PAINTING & DECORATING CO., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711
Represented By: STEVEN J. BUSHINSKY
Represented By: W. DANIEL FEEHAN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND
Represented By: STEVEN J. BUSHINSKY
Represented By: W. DANIEL FEEHAN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 VACATION FUND
Represented By: STEVEN J. BUSHINSKY
Represented By: W. DANIEL FEEHAN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRUSTEES OF PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE
Represented By: STEVEN J. BUSHINSKY
Represented By: W. DANIEL FEEHAN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE
Represented By: STEVEN J. BUSHINSKY
Represented By: W. DANIEL FEEHAN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND
Represented By: STEVEN J. BUSHINSKY
Represented By: W. DANIEL FEEHAN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 VACATION FUND
Represented By: STEVEN J. BUSHINSKY
Represented By: W. DANIEL FEEHAN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRITE-PAINTING & DECORATING CO., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?