HIGHSMITH v. WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP,INC. et al
Plaintiff: RICHARD HIGHSMITH
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10, ABC CORPS. 1-10, WHOLE FOODS MARKET INC. and WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv16812
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 12/9/2019. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 10/9/2019. (sm)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Keith Rosenblatt, Esq. re: matter resolved. (ROSENBLATT, KEITH)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER; granting #4 Defendant's letter request for a 30-day extension of time in which to file its Answer; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/11/2019. (sms)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Keith Rosenblatt, Esq. to the Hon. Esther Salas, U.S.D.J. requesting 30-day extension of time to file answer. (ROSENBLATT, KEITH)
August 16, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jr)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint.. (ROSENBLATT, KEITH)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WHOLE FOODS MARKET INC. identifying Amazon.com, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (ROSENBLATT, KEITH)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WHOLE FOODS MARKET INC. from New Jersey Superior Court, Law Division, Bergen County, case number BER-L-005255-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9900355), filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET INC.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)(ROSENBLATT, KEITH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HIGHSMITH v. WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP,INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPS. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHOLE FOODS MARKET INC.
Represented By: KEITH J. ROSENBLATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP, INC.
Represented By: KEITH J. ROSENBLATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD HIGHSMITH
Represented By: ADAM J. KLEINFELDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?