SOUMPHONPONPHAKDY v. WALILKO et al
Plaintiff: KHONGSANA SOUMPHONPONPHAKDY
Defendant: GEICO and MARY J WALILKO
Case Number: 2:2019cv16830
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Leda D Wettre
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 Letter to Reopen case; etc. Filed by Khongsana Soumphonphakdy. (sms)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER; denying #3 plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint; and the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 3; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 9/18/2019. (sms)
September 17, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Leave to File. Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint; Filed by KHONGSANA SOUMPHONPONPHAKDY. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Amended Complaint)(sms)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER; granting Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis; Plaintiff's Complaint is sua sponte DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6); etc. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 9/3/2019. (sms)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(bt, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2019: #3 Text of Proposed Order) (bt, ). (Attachment 3 replaced on 8/26/2019) (th).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SOUMPHONPONPHAKDY v. WALILKO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY J WALILKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KHONGSANA SOUMPHONPONPHAKDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?