POLYNICE v. NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Plaintiff: EDWIN POLYNICE
Defendant: NJ DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, JOHN DOES 1-10, S.C.O. JOHN DOE, NORTHERN STATE PRISON, sERGEANT GIBSON, GEORGE O. ROBINSON and NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Case Number: 2:2019cv16875
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 11/4/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (vm )
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, NORTHERN STATE PRISON, GEORGE O. ROBINSON. Responses due by 10/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 NOTICE OF MOTION, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(BRANCH, CHANELL)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by CHANELL MARIE BRANCH on behalf of NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, NORTHERN STATE PRISON, GEORGE O. ROBINSON (BRANCH, CHANELL)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter request for Defendants New Jersey Department of Corrections and Northern State Prison to answer, move, or otherwise reply until 10/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 9/20/2019. (vm )
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from DOC Defendants re: Time to Answer. (VOMACKA, MICHAEL)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EDWIN POLYNICE. GEORGE O. ROBINSON served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. (LENTO, JOSEPH)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EDWIN POLYNICE. NORTHERN STATE PRISON served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (LENTO, JOSEPH)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EDWIN POLYNICE. NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (LENTO, JOSEPH)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, NORTHERN STATE PRISON, GEORGE O. ROBINSON, SERGEANT GIBSON. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
August 20, 2019 Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (eu, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against S.C.O. JOHN DOE, JOHN DOES 1-10, GIBSON, NJ DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, NORTHERN STATE PRISON, GEORGE O. ROBINSON ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9903222) with JURY DEMAND, filed by EDWIN POLYNICE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LENTO, JOSEPH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: POLYNICE v. NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWIN POLYNICE
Represented By: JOSEPH D. LENTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NJ DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.C.O. JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHERN STATE PRISON
Represented By: CHANELL MARIE BRANCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: sERGEANT GIBSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE O. ROBINSON
Represented By: CHANELL MARIE BRANCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: CHANELL MARIE BRANCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?