BURNETT v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION et al
Plaintiff: HARTLYN BURNETT
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, ESSEX UNION POLICE DEPARTMENT and WILLLIE POWELL, JR.
Case Number: 2:2019cv16886
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Leda D Wettre
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 Letter requesting to dismiss the Motion from Hartlyn Burnett. (ams, )
September 19, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (byl)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by WILLLIE POWELL, JR. (KANNAH, NIXON)
September 10, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (byl)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. Responses due by 9/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Robert J. Gibson, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(KURUVILLA, BEN)
August 27, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #2 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/9/2019. (byl)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation.. (KURUVILLA, BEN)
August 20, 2019 Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (eu, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION from Superior Court of New Jersey, Essex County, case number ESX-L-007943-18., filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Summons and Complaint), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)(KURUVILLA, BEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BURNETT v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Represented By: BEN KURUVILLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESSEX UNION POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLLIE POWELL, JR.
Represented By: NIXON TEAH KANNAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARTLYN BURNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?