TRUSTEES OF THE NEW JERSEY B.A.C. HEALTH FUND et al v. WILLIAM WATTS OF NEW JERSEY LLC
Plaintiff: TRUSTEES OF THE B.A.C. LOCAL 4 NEW JERSEY PENSION FUND, TRUSTEES OF THE NEW JERSEY B.A.C. ANNUITY FUND, TRUSTEES OF THE BRICKLAYERS & ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS INTERNATIONAL PENSION FUND and TRUSTEES OF THE NEW JERSEY B.A.C. HEALTH FUND
Defendant: WILLIAM WATTS OF NEW JERSEY LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv16964
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph A Dickson
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to the Complaint re #9 Stipulation. The time within which Defendant may answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint in the above-captioned matter is extended by 15 days, to and including 10/30/2019. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/16/2019. (dam, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend time to Answer by WILLIAM WATTS OF NEW JERSEY LLC. (SICKLES, KAY)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to the Complaint re #7 Stipulation. Defendant's time to respond to the Complaint is extended through and including 10/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 9/13/2019. (dam, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of time to respond to Complaint by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order granting extension of time to respond to complaint)(SICKLES, KAY)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by KAY E SICKLES on behalf of All Defendants (SICKLES, KAY)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRUSTEES OF THE NEW JERSEY B.A.C. HEALTH FUND, TRUSTEES OF THE BRICKLAYERS & ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS INTERNATIONAL PENSION FUND, TRUSTEES OF THE B.A.C. LOCAL 4 NEW JERSEY PENSION FUND, TRUSTEES OF THE NEW JERSEY B.A.C. ANNUITY FUND. WILLIAM WATTS OF NEW JERSEY LLC served on 8/24/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (MARIMON, NICOLE)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 Exhibit to #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet by TRUSTEES OF THE B.A.C. LOCAL 4 NEW JERSEY PENSION FUND, TRUSTEES OF THE BRICKLAYERS & ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS INTERNATIONAL PENSION FUND, TRUSTEES OF THE NEW JERSEY B.A.C. ANNUITY FUND, TRUSTEES OF THE NEW JERSEY B.A.C. HEALTH FUND. (MARIMON, NICOLE)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to WILLIAM WATTS OF NEW JERSEY LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, )
August 21, 2019 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson added. (eu, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRUSTEES OF THE B.A.C. LOCAL 4 NEW JERSEY PENSION FUND, TRUSTEES OF THE BRICKLAYERS & ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS INTERNATIONAL PENSION FUND, TRUSTEES OF THE NEW JERSEY B.A.C. ANNUITY FUND, TRUSTEES OF THE NEW JERSEY B.A.C. HEALTH FUND. (MARIMON, NICOLE)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WILLIAM WATTS OF NEW JERSEY LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9906875), filed by TRUSTEES OF THE NEW JERSEY B.A.C. HEALTH FUND, TRUSTEES OF THE BRICKLAYERS & ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS INTERNATIONAL PENSION FUND, TRUSTEES OF THE B.A.C. LOCAL 4 NEW JERSEY PENSION FUND, TRUSTEES OF THE NEW JERSEY B.A.C. ANNUITY FUND.(MARIMON, NICOLE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRUSTEES OF THE NEW JERSEY B.A.C. HEALTH FUND et al v. WILLIAM WATTS OF NEW JERSEY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRUSTEES OF THE B.A.C. LOCAL 4 NEW JERSEY PENSION FUND
Represented By: NICOLE MARIE MARIMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRUSTEES OF THE NEW JERSEY B.A.C. ANNUITY FUND
Represented By: NICOLE MARIE MARIMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRUSTEES OF THE BRICKLAYERS & ALLIED CRAFTWORKERS INTERNATIONAL PENSION FUND
Represented By: NICOLE MARIE MARIMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRUSTEES OF THE NEW JERSEY B.A.C. HEALTH FUND
Represented By: NICOLE MARIE MARIMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM WATTS OF NEW JERSEY LLC
Represented By: KAY E SICKLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?