Oswald et al v. American Medical Collection Agency, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marcia Sorin-Rosenthal, ROBERT OSWALD, STEPHEN ROSENTHAL and Mary Beth Kerns
Defendant: AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY INC and LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS
In Re: AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv17036
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Member Case Transferred in on 8/22/19 from the Southern District of New York 7:19-cv-05302 for MDL 2904 AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION(gh, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (gh, )
August 22, 2019 Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (gh, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 7:19-cv-05302. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 15, 2019 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (sjo)
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (Signed by MDL Panel on 8/9/2019) (sjo)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiffs and LabCorp, by and through their undersigned counsel, that the time within which Defendant must answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to September 9, 2019. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiffs and LabCorp, by and through their undersigned counsel, agree that should the Related Actions not be consolidated into an MDL and should LabCorp respond to a complaint in another Related Action that LabCorp will likewise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on the same day. Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings answer due 9/9/2019. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 7/8/2019) (mro)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. (Kisloff, Michelle)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings.(Kisloff, Michelle)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michelle Anne Kisloff on behalf of Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. (Kisloff, Michelle)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. Service was accepted by Janice Parker - Receptionist. Document filed by Stephen Rosenthal; Robert Oswald; Marcia Sorin-Rosenthal; Mary Beth Kerns. (Seeger, Christopher)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. American Medical Collection Agency, Inc. served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. Service was accepted by Company Employee Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Stephen Rosenthal; Robert Oswald; Marcia Sorin-Rosenthal; Mary Beth Kerns. (Seeger, Christopher)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Medical Collection Agency, Inc., Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. (pc)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., and LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Mary Beth Kerns, Robert Oswald, Stephen Rosenthal, Marcia Sorin-Rosenthal. (Nussbaum, Linda)
June 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Linda P. Nussbaum to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Plaintiff's attorney information was omitted from PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
June 6, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
June 6, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
June 6, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
June 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Linda P. Nussbaum. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code n (None). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff). (sj)
June 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Linda P. Nussbaum. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Robert Oswald; Mary Beth Kerns; Marcia Sorin-Rosenthal; Stephen Rosenthal. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (sj)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to American Medical Collection Agency, Inc.; Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Mary Beth Kerns, Robert Oswald, Stephen Rosenthal, Marcia Sorin-Rosenthal. (Nussbaum, Linda) Modified on 6/6/2019 (sj).
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Nussbaum, Linda)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Medical Collection Agency, Inc., Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17025923)Document filed by Stephen Rosenthal, Robert Oswald, Marcia Sorin-Rosenthal, Mary Beth Kerns.(Nussbaum, Linda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oswald et al v. American Medical Collection Agency, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Sorin-Rosenthal
Represented By: LINDA P. NUSSBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT OSWALD
Represented By: LINDA P. NUSSBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN ROSENTHAL
Represented By: LINDA P. NUSSBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Beth Kerns
Represented By: LINDA P. NUSSBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS
Represented By: Michelle Anne Kisloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?