Lanouette et al v. Retrieval-Masters Creditors Bureau, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: JANE DOE and Brian Lanouette
Defendant: RETRIEVAL-MASTERS CREDITOR'S BUREAU, INC., OPTUM360 LLC and QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED
In Re: AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv17046
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Member Case Transferred in on 8/22/19 from the Southern District of New York 7:19-05216 for MDL 2904 AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION (gh, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (gh, )
August 22, 2019 Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (gh, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 7:19-cv-05216. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 8, 2019 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (sjo)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (Signed by MDL Panel on 7/31/2019) (sjo)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Retrieval-Masters Creditors Bureau, Inc.. (jgo)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Quest Diagnostics Incorporated. (jgo)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Optum360, LLC. (jgo)
June 5, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 5, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
June 5, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Retrieval-Masters Creditors Bureau, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jane Doe, Brian Lanouette. (Sheehan, Spencer)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Quest Diagnostics Incorporated, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jane Doe, Brian Lanouette. (Sheehan, Spencer)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Optum360, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jane Doe, Brian Lanouette. (Sheehan, Spencer)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sheehan, Spencer)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Optum360, LLC, Quest Diagnostics Incorporated, Retrieval-Masters Creditors Bureau, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17011294)Document filed by Brian Lanouette, Jane Doe.(Sheehan, Spencer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lanouette et al v. Retrieval-Masters Creditors Bureau, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RETRIEVAL-MASTERS CREDITOR'S BUREAU, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUM360 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE DOE
Represented By: Spencer Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Lanouette
Represented By: Spencer Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?