UNITED RENTALS (NORTH AMERICA), INC. v. LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: UNITED RENTALS (NORTH AMERICA), INC.
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv17169
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Stanley R Chesler
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, )
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor in courtroom 4D on 11/19/19 at 10am. Local counsel must be present. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 10/7/19. (tjg, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying liberty Mutual Group as Corporate Parent.. (BRYANT, DEBORAH)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY.(BRYANT, DEBORAH)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by DEBORAH ANN BRYANT on behalf of LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY (BRYANT, DEBORAH)
September 18, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/3/2019. (ld, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Deft. Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co... (BRYANT, DEBORAH)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company via NJDOBI on August 29, 2019, filed by UNITED RENTALS (NORTH AMERICA), INC.. (GUERTIN, THERESA)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jd, )
August 23, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITED RENTALS (NORTH AMERICA), INC. identifying United Rentals, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (GUERTIN, THERESA)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9916682) with JURY DEMAND, filed by UNITED RENTALS (NORTH AMERICA), INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Fritz Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - O'Keefe Complaint)(GUERTIN, THERESA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED RENTALS (NORTH AMERICA), INC. v. LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: DEBORAH ANN BRYANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED RENTALS (NORTH AMERICA), INC.
Represented By: THERESA A. GUERTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?