DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. v. NEIL KAMAL, INC. et al
Plaintiff: DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.
Defendant: BABUBHAI R. PATEL, NEIL KAMAL, INC. and SANGEETA B. PATEL
Case Number: 2:2019cv17175
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Katharine S Hayden
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants Defendants request (DE 6) to extend time to answer, move, or otherwise reply to the Complaint to October 10, 2019.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 10/1/19. (tjg, )
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to all defendants.. (FUSCO, FRANK)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.. NEIL KAMAL, INC. served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019; BABUBHAI R. PATEL served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019; SANGEETA B. PATEL served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019. (COUCH, BRYAN)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to NEIL KAMAL, INC., BABUBHAI R. PATEL, SANGEETA B. PATEL. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (vm)
August 26, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Katharine S. Hayden and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH C. MEGARIOTIS on behalf of DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. (MEGARIOTIS, JOSEPH)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. identifying WYNDHAM HOTEL GROUP, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (COUCH, BRYAN)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NEIL KAMAL, INC., BABUBHAI R. PATEL, SANGEETA B. PATEL ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9917767), filed by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(COUCH, BRYAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. v. NEIL KAMAL, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BABUBHAI R. PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEIL KAMAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANGEETA B. PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH C. MEGARIOTIS
Represented By: BRYAN PAUL COUCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?