DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. v. OKC HOSPITALITY, INC. et al
Plaintiff: DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.
Defendant: OKC HOSPITALITY, INC. and DHARMESH PATEL
Case Number: 2:2019cv17185
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Leda D Wettre
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to OKC Hospitality, Inc. and Dharmesh Patel. for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (JB, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Default by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. against OKC Hospitality, Inc. and Dharmesh Patel. (COUCH, BRYAN)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.. OKC HOSPITALITY, INC. served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019; DHARMESH PATEL served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019. (COUCH, BRYAN)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIA S. BEAUFORT on behalf of DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. (BEAUFORT, BRIA)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to OKC HOSPITALITY, INC., DHARMESH PATEL. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
August 26, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (ak, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. identifying WYNDHAM HOTEL GROUP, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (COUCH, BRYAN)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OKC HOSPITALITY, INC., DHARMESH PATEL ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9918421), filed by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(COUCH, BRYAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. v. OKC HOSPITALITY, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.
Represented By: BRYAN PAUL COUCH
Represented By: BRIA S. BEAUFORT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OKC HOSPITALITY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHARMESH PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?