DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. v. YUG HOSPITALITY, LLC et al
Plaintiff: DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.
Defendant: LEENA PATEL, SHAILESH PATEL and YUG HOSPITALITY, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv17191
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Esther Salas
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee: as to Jeffrey A. Bartos, Esq. $ 150, receipt number NEW040670. (sms)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER; that the Defendant's shall serve and file an Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before November 4, 2019; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 10/1/2019. (sms)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Pretrial Order CONSENT ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.. (COUCH, BRYAN)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.. LEENA PATEL served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019; SHAILESH PATEL served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019; YUG HOSPITALITY, LLC served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (COUCH, BRYAN)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to LEENA PATEL, SHAILESH PATEL, YUG HOSPITALITY, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jd, )
August 26, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH C. MEGARIOTIS on behalf of DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. (MEGARIOTIS, JOSEPH)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. identifying WYNDHAM HOTEL GROUP, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (COUCH, BRYAN)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LEENA PATEL, SHAILESH PATEL, YUG HOSPITALITY, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9919090), filed by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(COUCH, BRYAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. v. YUG HOSPITALITY, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH C. MEGARIOTIS
Represented By: BRYAN PAUL COUCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEENA PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAILESH PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YUG HOSPITALITY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?