WARE v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Petitioner: REGINALD H. WARE
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2019cv17224
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Letter from REGINALD WARE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dam, )
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the United States shall, within sixty (60) days of the entry of this Order, file an Answer in Ware's present habeas matter. Ware may, within thirty (30) days of receiving the United States' Answer or other appropriate motion, submit a response to the same. etc. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 8/3/2019. (dam, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) pursuant to the Johnson Ruling. In Re to Criminal Case file 2:11-cr-00224-JMV-1, filed by REGINALD H. WARE. "Forwarded to FPD'S Office". (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Order)(bt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WARE v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: JOSE ALMONTE
Represented By: ROBERT L. FRAZER
Represented By: JOHN GAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: REGINALD H. WARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?