RODRIGUEZ v. AVENEL ISELIN MEDICAL GROUP et al
Plaintiff: DARLINE RODRIGUEZ
Defendant: AVENEL ISELIN MEDICAL GROUP and PREMIER PERSONNEL GROUP, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv17423
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DARLINE RODRIGUEZ. PREMIER PERSONNEL GROUP, INC. waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DARLINE RODRIGUEZ. AVENEL ISELIN MEDICAL GROUP waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AVENEL ISELIN MEDICAL GROUP, PREMIER PERSONNEL GROUP, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, )
August 30, 2019 Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (eu, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AVENEL ISELIN MEDICAL GROUP , PREMIER PERSONNEL GROUP, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9929988) with JURY DEMAND, filed by DARLINE RODRIGUEZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MURPHY, MICHAEL) Modified on 8/30/2019 (qa, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RODRIGUEZ v. AVENEL ISELIN MEDICAL GROUP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARLINE RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: MICHAEL P. MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVENEL ISELIN MEDICAL GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PREMIER PERSONNEL GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?