GURVEY v. TOWNSHIP OF MONTCLAIR NEW JERSEY et al
Plaintiff: HAROLD SCOTT GURVEY
Defendant: MONTCLAIR POLICE DEPARTMENT, OFFICER THOMAS PATTI, TOWNSHIP OF MONTCLAIR NEW JERSEY, LT ROBERT ROMITO, CAPTAIN SCOTT BUEHLER, OFFICER ROBERT HANSFIELD, CAPTAIN EMIL DUL, OFFICER GLENDA RIVERA, POLICE DOES I-X and OFFICER KEITH LUMPKIN
Case Number: 2:2019cv17525
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Edward S Kiel
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LETTER ORDER: An in-person initial scheduling conference shall be held on 11/21/2019 at 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 8 of the U.S. Post Office and Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The parties shall submit a proposed Joint Discovery Plan as a Word document, to ESK_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Courts form Joint Discovery Plan may be found at www.njd.uscourts.gov/content/edward-s-kiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 10/21/2019. (as, ) Modified on 10/21/2019 (as, ).
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Default by HAROLD SCOTT GURVEY against TOWNSHIP OF MONTCLAIR NEW JERSEY, MONTCLAIR POLICE DEPARTMENT, CAPTAIN EMIL DUL, CAPTAIN SCOTT BUEHLER, LT ROBERT ROMITO, OFFICER THOMAS PATTI, OFFICER ROBERT HANSFIELD, OFFICER KEITH LUMPKIN, OFFICER GLENDA RIVERA and, POLICE DOES I-X. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vm )
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by SCOTT BUEHLER, EMIL DUL, ROBERT HANSFIELD, KEITH LUMPKIN, MONTCLAIR POLICE DEPARTMENT, THOMAS PATTI, GLENDA RIVERA, ROBERT ROMITO, TOWNSHIP OF MONTCLAIR NEW JERSEY.(MARCHESE, CLAUDIA)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ROBERT ROMITO, POLICE DOES I-X, MONTCLAIR POLICE DEPARTMENT, THOMAS PATTI, KEITH LUMPKIN, TOWNSHIP OF MONTCLAIR NEW JERSEY, ROBERT HANSFIELD, EMIL DUL, GLENDA RIVERA, SCOTT BUEHLER. ROBERT ROMITO served on 9/14/2019, answer due 10/7/2019; POLICE DOES I-X served on 9/14/2019, answer due 10/7/2019; MONTCLAIR POLICE DEPARTMENT served on 9/14/2019, answer due 10/7/2019; THOMAS PATTI served on 9/14/2019, answer due 10/7/2019; KEITH LUMPKIN served on 9/14/2019, answer due 10/7/2019; TOWNSHIP OF MONTCLAIR NEW JERSEY served on 9/14/2019, answer due 10/7/2019; ROBERT HANSFIELD served on 9/14/2019, answer due 10/7/2019; EMIL DUL served on 9/14/2019, answer due 10/7/2019; GLENDA RIVERA served on 9/14/2019, answer due 10/7/2019; SCOTT BUEHLER served on 9/14/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vm)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to SCOTT BUEHLER, EMIL DUL, ROBERT HANSFIELD, KEITH LUMPKIN, MONTCLAIR POLICE DEPARTMENT, THOMAS PATTI, ROBERT ROMITO, TOWNSHIP OF MONTCLAIR NEW JERSEY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SCOTT BUEHLER, EMIL DUL, ROBERT HANSFIELD, KEITH LUMPKIN, MONTCLAIR POLICE DEPARTMENT, THOMAS PATTI, GLENDA RIVERA, ROBERT ROMITO, TOWNSHIP OF MONTCLAIR NEW JERSEY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number NEW040427) with JURY DEMAND, filed by HAROLD SCOTT GURVEY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(qa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GURVEY v. TOWNSHIP OF MONTCLAIR NEW JERSEY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAROLD SCOTT GURVEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONTCLAIR POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: CLAUDIA L. MARCHESE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER THOMAS PATTI
Represented By: CLAUDIA L. MARCHESE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWNSHIP OF MONTCLAIR NEW JERSEY
Represented By: CLAUDIA L. MARCHESE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT ROBERT ROMITO
Represented By: CLAUDIA L. MARCHESE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPTAIN SCOTT BUEHLER
Represented By: CLAUDIA L. MARCHESE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER ROBERT HANSFIELD
Represented By: CLAUDIA L. MARCHESE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPTAIN EMIL DUL
Represented By: CLAUDIA L. MARCHESE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER GLENDA RIVERA
Represented By: CLAUDIA L. MARCHESE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLICE DOES I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER KEITH LUMPKIN
Represented By: CLAUDIA L. MARCHESE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?