GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. et al v. ALLIED NEUROLOGY AND INTERVENTIONAL PAIN PRACTICE, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. (GEICO), GEICO CASUALTY CO. and GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: BEHZAD SALIMI, M.D., DARIUSZ J. NASIEK, M.D., TARIQ MIAN, M.D., ALLIED NEUROLOGY AND INTERVENTIONAL PAIN PRACTICE, P.C. f/k/a ALLIED NEUROLOGY AND INTERVENTIONAL PAIN MANAGEMENT, P.C., NASIEK MEDICAL, L.L.C. f/k/a ANESTHESIA AND PAIN PROFESSIONAL PRACTICE L.L.C., DAVID ROSENBAUM, M.D. and ALLIED BOARD CERTIFIED PHYSICIANS, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2019cv17614
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Steven C Mannion
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 18 Letter from Keith Roberts, Esq. enclosing Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer re Case Assigned/Reassigned, #1 Complaint,, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty). (Attachments: #1 Stipulation to Extend time to Answer)(ROBERTS, KEITH)
November 1, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY JIHUN BANG on behalf of GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. (BANG, TIMOTHY)
October 31, 2019 Filing 16 Joint Discovery Plan by GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(KANG, GENE)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Scheduling Initial R16 Conference for 11/8/2019 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 10/23/2019. (spc, )
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #12 Defendant's Letter. A Rule 16 Conference shall be held on 11/8/2019 at 10:00 AM. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 10/22/2019. (dam, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 13 Letter from Shannon Carroll, Esq. in re extension of time to file answer. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation to extend time to answer)(CARROLL, SHANNON)
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from Brandon Minde re: consent to extend time to answer for defendant Salimi. (MINDE, BRANDON)
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by BRANDON D. MINDE on behalf of BEHZAD SALIMI, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MINDE, BRANDON)
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. DAVID ROSENBAUM, M.D. served on 10/16/2019, answer due 11/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KANG, GENE)
October 7, 2019 Clerk's Text Order - The document #9 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by NASIEK MEDICAL, L.L.C., BEHZAD SALIMI, M.D., ALLIED BOARD CERTIFIED PHYSICIANS, L.L.C., DAVID ROSENBAUM, M.D., DARIUSZ J. NASIEK, M.D., ALLIED NEUROLOGY AND INTERVENTIONAL PAIN PRACTICE, P.C. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/21/2019. (dam, )
October 7, 2019 Clerk's Text Order - The document #8 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by TARIQ MIAN, M.D. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/18/2019. (dam, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Allied Neurology, Nasiek Medical, Allied Board Certified Physicians, Dr. Nasiek, Dr. Rosenbaum, Dr. Salimi.. (CARROLL, SHANNON)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Dr. Mian. Attorney KEITH J. ROBERTS for ALLIED BOARD CERTIFIED PHYSICIANS, L.L.C.,KEITH J. ROBERTS for ALLIED NEUROLOGY AND INTERVENTIONAL PAIN PRACTICE, P.C.,KEITH J. ROBERTS for TARIQ MIAN, M.D.,KEITH J. ROBERTS for NASIEK MEDICAL, L.L.C.,KEITH J. ROBERTS for DARIUSZ J. NASIEK, M.D.,KEITH J. ROBERTS for DAVID ROSENBAUM, M.D.,KEITH J. ROBERTS for BEHZAD SALIMI, M.D. added. (CARROLL, SHANNON)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. ALLIED BOARD CERTIFIED PHYSICIANS, L.L.C. served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019; ALLIED NEUROLOGY AND INTERVENTIONAL PAIN PRACTICE, P.C. served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019; TARIQ MIAN, M.D. served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019; NASIEK MEDICAL, L.L.C. served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019; DARIUSZ J. NASIEK, M.D. served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019; BEHZAD SALIMI, M.D. served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed on Allied Neurology and Interventional Pain Practice, P.C. f/k/a Allied Neurology and Interventional Pain Management, P.C., #2 Summons Returned Executed on Behzad Salimi, M.D., #3 Summons Returned Executed on Dariuz Nasiek, M.D., #4 Summons Returned Executed on Nasiek Medical LLC f/k/a Anesthesia and Pain Professional Practice LLC, #5 Summons Returned Executed on Tariq Mian, M.D., #6 Certificate of Service)(KANG, GENE)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to MAX GERSHENOFF and STEVEN T. HENESY. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 9/17/2019. (dam, )
September 12, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #5 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Max Gershenoff and Steven T. Henesy. Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Max Gershenoff and Steven T. Henesy by GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #2 Certification of Gene Y. Kang, #3 Certification of Max Gershenoff in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #4 Certification of Steven T. Henesy in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(KANG, GENE)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by GENE Y. KANG on behalf of GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. (KANG, GENE)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALLIED BOARD CERTIFIED PHYSICIANS, L.L.C., ALLIED NEUROLOGY AND INTERVENTIONAL PAIN PRACTICE, P.C. f/k/a ALLIED NEUROLOGY AND INTERVENTIONAL PAIN MANAGEMENT, P.C., TARIQ MIAN, M.D., NASIEK MEDICAL, L.L.C., DARIUSZ J. NASIEK, M.D., DAVID ROSENBAUM, M.D., BEHZAD SALIMI, M.D.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam, )
September 4, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. (jr)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. (GEICO) identifying Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (ROBERTELLI, JOHN)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALLIED BOARD CERTIFIED PHYSICIANS, L.L.C., ALLIED NEUROLOGY AND INTERVENTIONAL PAIN PRACTICE, P.C. f/k/a ALLIED NEUROLOGY AND INTERVENTIONAL PAIN MANAGEMENT, P.C., TARIQ MIAN, M.D., NASIEK MEDICAL, L.L.C. f/k/a ANESTHESIA AND PAIN PROFESSIONAL PRACTICE L.L.C., DARIUSZ J. NASIEK, M.D., DAVID ROSENBAUM, M.D., BEHZAD SALIMI, M.D. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9939238) with JURY DEMAND, filed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. (GEICO). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ROBERTELLI, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. et al v. ALLIED NEUROLOGY AND INTERVENTIONAL PAIN PRACTICE, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEHZAD SALIMI, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DARIUSZ J. NASIEK, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARIQ MIAN, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIED NEUROLOGY AND INTERVENTIONAL PAIN PRACTICE, P.C. f/k/a ALLIED NEUROLOGY AND INTERVENTIONAL PAIN MANAGEMENT, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NASIEK MEDICAL, L.L.C. f/k/a ANESTHESIA AND PAIN PROFESSIONAL PRACTICE L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID ROSENBAUM, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIED BOARD CERTIFIED PHYSICIANS, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO INDEMNITY CO.
Represented By: JOHN J. ROBERTELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. (GEICO)
Represented By: JOHN J. ROBERTELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO CASUALTY CO.
Represented By: JOHN J. ROBERTELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JOHN J. ROBERTELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?