Shane Dragoo v. Quest Diagnostics Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: SHANE DRAGOO
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive, OPTUM360 SERVICES, INC. and QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED
In Re: AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv17638
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 34 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by SHANE DRAGOO re #27 MOTION to Remand (TEED, CORY)
October 21, 2019 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by OPTUM360 SERVICES, INC., QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED re #27 MOTION to Remand (JOYCE, EAMON)
October 2, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #27 MOTION to Remand . Responses due by 10/21/2019 Replies due by 10/28/2019. Motion set for 11/4/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (gh, )
September 26, 2019 Filing 32 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by OPTUM360 SERVICES, INC. re #27 MOTION to Remand (SELIGMANN, READE)
September 26, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by READE WILLIAM SELIGMANN on behalf of OPTUM360 SERVICES, INC. (SELIGMANN, READE)
September 25, 2019 Filing 30 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #27 MOTION to Remand . (HENSLEY, MICHAEL)
September 20, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL T. HENSLEY on behalf of QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED (HENSLEY, MICHAEL)
September 20, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by ANN MARIE EFFINGHAM on behalf of QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED (EFFINGHAM, ANN)
September 19, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #27 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Remand by SHANE DRAGOO. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Plaintiff, #3 Declaration of Cory M. Teed and Exhibit A, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(TEED, CORY)
September 6, 2019 Member Case Transferred in on 9/5/19 from the Central District of California 2:19-cv-07223 for MDL 2904 AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION (gh, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 26 Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (gh, )
September 5, 2019 Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (gh, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 25 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-07223. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 3, 2019 Filing 24 Conditional Transfer Order - 5 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2904, transferring case to USDC, District of New Jersey and assigned to Honorable Madeline C. Arleo. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #21 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Vacate Order to Show Cause and Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause entered August 27, 2019 is VACATED. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
August 29, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE Of Transfer to the United States District Court For The District of New Jersey filed by Defendant Optum360 Services, Inc.. (Akerman, Alexander)
August 28, 2019 Filing 21 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Vacate (Defendants' Ex Parte Application to Vacate Order to Show Cause and Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint) filed by Defendant Optum360 Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application to Vacate Order to Show Cause and to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint, #2 Declaration of Alexander Akerman in Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application to Vacate Order to Show Cause and to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint, #3 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Ex Parte Application to Vacate Order to Show Cause and Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint) (Akerman, Alexander)
August 27, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Detemination on Transfer by JPML filed by defendant Quest Diagnostics Incorporated. Motion set for hearing on 9/30/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Point and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Amy P Lally, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proof of Service) (Lally, Amy)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 [VACATED] MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Show Cause Response due by 8/30/2019. (twdb) Modified on 8/29/2019 (dgo).
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-01091 DOC(KESx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian and Judge Dolly M. Gee to Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-07223 DOC(KESx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter (rn)
August 22, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #3 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
August 22, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (ghap)
August 21, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shane Dragoo, upon Defendant Optum360 Services, Inc. served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kathy Prescher(Intake Specialist)-Person Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/2/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT C TO AMENDED JOINT NOTICE OF REMOVAL DOCUMENT NUMBER 12) (ghap)
August 21, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shane Dragoo, upon Defendant Quest Diagnostics Incorporated served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Clarence Kerr- Person Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/2/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT C TO AMENDED JOINT NOTICE OF REMOVAL DOCUMENT NUMBER 12) (ghap)
August 21, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Optum360 Services, Inc., Quest Diagnostics Incorporated. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Shane Dragoo. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/10/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO AMENDED JOINT NOTICE OF REMOVAL DOCUMENT NUMBER 12) (ghap)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED d/b/a QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED OF NEVADA, a Nevada corporation. correcting Amended Document (Non-Motion), #11 (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Lally, Amy)
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendant QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED d/b/a QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED OF NEVADA, a Nevada corporation. Amendment to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proof of Service)(Lally, Amy)
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendant QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED d/b/a QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED OF NEVADA, a Nevada corporation. Amendment to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, B, C, D, #2 Proof of Service)(Lally, Amy)
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED d/b/a QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED OF NEVADA, a Nevada corporation, re Notice of Related Case(s) #9 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #5 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 served on 8/20/19. (Lally, Amy)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED d/b/a QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED OF NEVADA, a Nevada corporation. Related Case(s): 2:19-cv-05071;8:19-cv-01091;5:19-cv-01029;2:19-cv-05817 (Lally, Amy)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE Notice of Petition to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation [Local Rule 83-1.4.3] filed by Defendant Optum360 Services, Inc.. (Akerman, Alexander)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Initial) filed by Defendant Optum360 Services, Inc. identifying Optum Rocket, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., OptumInsight Holdings, LLC, Optum, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated as Corporate Parent. (Akerman, Alexander)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Optum360 Services, Inc., identifying Optum Rocket, Inc.; OptumInsight, Inc.; OptumInsight Holdings, LLC; Optum, Inc.; United HealthCare Services, Inc.; UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Akerman, Alexander)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alexander Akerman counsel for Defendant Optum360 Services, Inc.. Adding Alexander Akerman as counsel of record for Optum360 Services, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Optum360 Services, Inc.. (Attorney Alexander Akerman added to party Optum360 Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Akerman, Alexander)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED d/b/a QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED OF NEVADA, a Nevada corporation, (Lally, Amy)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Amy P Lally on behalf of Defendant QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED d/b/a QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED OF NEVADA, a Nevada corporation (Lally, Amy)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED d/b/a QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED OF NEVADA, a Nevada corporation. (Lally, Amy)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California, County of San Luis Obispo, case number 19LC-0676 Receipt No: 0973-24292472 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED d/b/a QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED OF NEVADA, a Nevada corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of Summons and Complaint served on Defendants, #2 Exhibit B - Quest Diagnostics Incorporated Form 10-Q cover page, #3 Exhibit C - Delaware Department of State entity detail for Optum360 Services, Inc.) (Attorney Amy P Lally added to party QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED d/b/a QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED OF NEVADA, a Nevada corporation(pty:dft))(Lally, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shane Dragoo v. Quest Diagnostics Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUM360 SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Alexander Akerman
Represented By: READE WILLIAM SELIGMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED
Represented By: Amy P. Lally
Represented By: MICHAEL T. HENSLEY
Represented By: ANN MARIE EFFINGHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANE DRAGOO
Represented By: Cory M Teed
Represented By: Jeremy S Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?