BLOCKER v. PRUITT
Plaintiff: KAREEM BLOCKER
Defendant: OFFICER J. PRUITT
Case Number: 2:2019cv17713
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Steven C Mannion
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that the Clerk shall Reopen this matter for the purpose of filing this Opinion and Order; plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis #8 is denied without prejudice; the Clerk shall administratively terminate this case; plaintiff may have the above entitled case reopened if within 30 days of the date of the entry of this Order, plaintiff wither prepays the $400 filing fee or submits to the Clerk a complete signed in forma pauperis application, including a certified six-month prison account statement and complete affidavit; upon receipt of a writing from plaintiff stating that he wishes to reopen this case and either a complete in forma pauperis application or filing fee within the time allotted by the Court, the Clerk will be directed to reopen this case. The Clerk shall serve on plaintiff by regular U.S. mail the Opinion and Order and a blank form application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner in a civil rights case. form DNJ-ProSe-007-A (Rev. 05/2013). Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 10/28/2019. (sm)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 10/28/2019. (sm)
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from Kareem Blocker. (sm)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 Letter and attachments from Kareem Blocker. (sm)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that the Clerk shall Reopen this matter for the purpose of filing this Opinion and Order; plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis #5 is denied without prejudice; the Clerk shall administratively terminate this case; plaintiff may have the above case reopened within 30 days of the date of the entry of this order if plaintiff either pre-pays the $400 filing fee or submits to the Clerk a complete signed in forma pauperis application including a six-month prison account statement and complete affidavit; upon receipt of a writing from plaintiff stating that he wishes to reopen this case and either a complete in forma pauperis application or filing fee within the time allotted by this Court, the Clerk will be directed to reopen this case; the Clerk shall serve on plaintiff by regular U.S. mail the opinion and order, a blank form application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner in a civil rights case. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 10/8/2019. (sm)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 10/8/2019. (sm)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Kareem Blocker dated 9/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP, #2 Attachment)(sm)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Clerk shall administratively terminate this case; Plaintiff may have the case reopened within 30 days of the date of the entry of this order if he either prepays the $400 filing fee or submits to the Clerk a complete signed in forma pauperis application; upon receipt of a writing from Plaintiff stating that he wishes to reopen this case and either a complete in forma pauperis application or filing fee within the time allotted by this Court, the Clerk will be directed to reopen this case; the Clerk shall serve on Plaintiff by regular U.S. mail this Memorandum and Order and a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 9/23/2019. (sm)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Kareem Blocker. (ams, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 Letter from Kareem Blocker. (sm)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope) (jc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BLOCKER v. PRUITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER J. PRUITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREEM BLOCKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?