GRAY v. LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS, et al
Plaintiff: ERIN THERESA GRAY
Defendant: OPTUM360 LLC, QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED and LABORATORY CORPORATIONS OF AMERICA HOLDINGS
In Re: AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv17788
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Member Case Transferred in on 9/9/19 from the Middle District of Georgia 4:19-cv-00139 for MDL 2904 AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION. (gh, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (gh, )
September 9, 2019 Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (gh, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Georgia Middle; Case Number 4:19-cv-00139. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 9, 2019 Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to New Jersey. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 9/23/2019. (esl)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 MDL TRANSFER ORDER transferring proceedings to the USDC District of New Jersey for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (esl)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ERIN THERESA GRAY as to OPTUM360 LLC. (GIBSON, MARYBETH)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ERIN THERESA GRAY as to LABORATORY CORPORATIONS OF AMERICA HOLDINGS. (GIBSON, MARYBETH)
August 23, 2019 Notice of Deficiency, No need to re-file; Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by ERIN THERESA GRAY; Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia(tlf).
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED (tlf).
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons issued as to OPTUM360 LLC (tlf).
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons issued as to LABORATORY CORPORATIONS OF AMERICA HOLDINGS (tlf).
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (IFP) against Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings, Optum360 LLC, QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED filed by Erin Theresa Gray (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(GIBSON, MARYBETH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRAY v. LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUM360 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LABORATORY CORPORATIONS OF AMERICA HOLDINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIN THERESA GRAY
Represented By: J BENJAMIN FINLEY
Represented By: MARYBETH V GIBSON
Represented By: MARYBETH V. GIBSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?