ROSENBLOOM v. TELEBRANDS CORP.
Plaintiff: BARBARA ROSENBLOOM
Defendant: TELEBRANDS CORP.
Case Number: 2:2019cv17872
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph A Dickson
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David T. Butsch and Christopher E. Roberts by BARBARA ROSENBLOOM, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/4/2019. (JB, )
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Plaintiff's request for an extension of the motion day for #6 to be extended until 12/2/2019. Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss .( Motion set for 12/2/2019 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court.) Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 10/30/2019. (sm)
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss . (PEARLMAN, PETER)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by TELEBRANDS CORP. re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Errata Re: Docket Entry No. 6-1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Docket Entry No. 6-1)(BESHADA, DONALD)
October 22, 2019 Set Deadlines as to Defendant's #6 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 11/18/2019 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jd, )
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 12/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2D before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/22/19. (jbb)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by TELEBRANDS CORP.. Responses due by 11/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Donald A. Beshada, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Donald A. Beshada, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(BESHADA, DONALD)
October 9, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #5 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David T. Butsch and Christopher E. Roberts. Motion set for 11/4/2019 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jd, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David T. Butsch and Christopher E. Roberts by BARBARA ROSENBLOOM. (Attachments: #1 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary, #2 Certification of Peter S. Pearlman, #3 Certification of David T. Butsch, #4 Certification of Christopher E. Roberts, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
October 7, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer submitted by TELEBRANDS CORP. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/21/2019. (jd, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Telebrands Corp.. Attorney DONALD ANTHONY BESHADA for TELEBRANDS CORP. added. (BESHADA, DONALD)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BARBARA ROSENBLOOM. TELEBRANDS CORP. served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to TELEBRANDS CORP.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jd, )
September 11, 2019 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson added. (eu, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TELEBRANDS CORP. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9954040) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BARBARA ROSENBLOOM. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PEARLMAN, PETER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROSENBLOOM v. TELEBRANDS CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TELEBRANDS CORP.
Represented By: DONALD ANTHONY BESHADA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA ROSENBLOOM
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?