SUPER 8 WORLDWIDE, INC. v. GODAVARI LODGING, LLC et al
Plaintiff: SUPER 8 WORLDWIDE, INC.
Defendant: KASHMIRA BHAKTA, GODAVARI LODGING, LLC and RAMESH BHAKTA
Case Number: 2:2019cv17930
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SUPER 8 WORLDWIDE, INC.. KASHMIRA BHAKTA served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019; RAMESH BHAKTA served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019; GODAVARI LODGING, LLC served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (COUCH, BRYAN)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to KASHMIRA BHAKTA, RAMESH BHAKTA, GODAVARI LODGING, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jd, )
September 12, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (eu, )
September 12, 2019 Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (eu, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SUPER 8 WORLDWIDE, INC. identifying WYNDHAM HOTELS & RESORTS, INC. as Corporate Parent. (jr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SUPER 8 WORLDWIDE, INC., KASHMIRA BHAKTA, RAMESH BHAKTA ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9958286), filed by SUPER 8 WORLDWIDE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(COUCH, BRYAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SUPER 8 WORLDWIDE, INC. v. GODAVARI LODGING, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KASHMIRA BHAKTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GODAVARI LODGING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAMESH BHAKTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUPER 8 WORLDWIDE, INC.
Represented By: BRYAN PAUL COUCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?