NOEL v. EXPERIAN et al
Plaintiff: SHAWN D. NOEL
Defendant: EQUIFAX INC. and EXPERIAN
Case Number: 2:2019cv17977
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on behalf of Experian and Equifax. Motion set for 12/2/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on behalf of Experian and Equifax by EXPERIAN. Responses due by 11/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief)(KOWAL, DOROTHY)
October 15, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by EQUIFAX INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/29/2019. (ld, )
October 14, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EQUIFAX INC. identifying Equifax Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (KLEIN, JONATHAN)
October 14, 2019 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Equifax Inc.. Attorney JONATHAN DANIEL KLEIN for EQUIFAX INC. added. (KLEIN, JONATHAN)
October 9, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by EXPERIAN has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/29/2019. (ams, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EXPERIAN identifying Experian plc as Corporate Parent.. (KOWAL, DOROTHY)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Attorney DOROTHY A. KOWAL for EXPERIAN added. (KOWAL, DOROTHY)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to EQUIFAX INC., EXPERIAN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EQUIFAX INC., EXPERIAN ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number NEW040519), filed by SHAWN D. NOEL. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A, #2 Schedule B, #3 Schedule C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically)(ld, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NOEL v. EXPERIAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUIFAX INC.
Represented By: JONATHAN DANIEL KLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPERIAN
Represented By: DOROTHY A. KOWAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAWN D. NOEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?