STEFANSKI v. THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: ANDREA STEFANSKI
Defendant: THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2019cv18056
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/17/2020 at 10:30 a.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 1/15/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/16/2019. (jqb, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA identifying Prudential Financial, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (BELL, ALNISA)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative and Additional Defenses by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA.(BELL, ALNISA)
October 9, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order for an extension of time to Answer, move or otherwise respond has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/29/2019. (byl)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint. Attorney ALNISA S. BELL for THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA added. (BELL, ALNISA)
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ANDREA STEFANSKI. THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (LASALLE, PAUL)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (byl)
September 20, 2019 Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (eu, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9970964), filed by ANDREA STEFANSKI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LASALLE, PAUL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STEFANSKI v. THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREA STEFANSKI
Represented By: PAUL L LASALLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: ALNISA S. BELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?