PRIVCAP FUNDING LLC v. LEVINE et al
Plaintiff: PRIVCAP FUNDING LLC
Defendant: NORTH BERGEN VENTURES, LLC, RIVERSIDE NORSE, LLC, SETH LEVINE, PERTH LP VENTURES, LLC, PASSAIC MAIN NORSE, LLC, AMBOY LP VENTURES, LLC, PAVILION NORSE, LLC, RED CLAY NORSE, LLC, 4318 KENNEDY PARTNERS, LLC and ELIZABETH LOUISA VENTURES, LLC
Not Yet Classified: COLLIERS INTERNATIONAL
Intervenor Defendant: ASCEND RE PARTNERS, LLC and DSE Family Investments VII, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv18122
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Letter from Defendant Seth Levine on Proposed Amended Receivership Order re #20 Letter,. (LUBERTAZZI, JOSEPH)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Letter from Jaimee Katz Sussner, Esq. to Hon. Madeline Cox Arleo, U.S.D.J.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Amended Receiver Order, #3 Exhibit A to Ex. 1 - List of Properties & Title Holders, #4 Exhibit B to Ex. 1 - Property Descriptions, #5 Exhibit C to Ex. 1 - Properties Subject to More than One Receiver Order)(SUSSNER, JAIMEE)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Telephone Conference held on 11/13/2019. (kd)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER - The telephone conference set for 11/13/2019 before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre shall proceed as scheduled to discuss the status of pending motions to intervene in light of the Amended Receiver Order before the Court and the lack of participation by defendants. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/6/2019. (rn)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Letter from Jaimee Katz Sussner, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(SUSSNER, JAIMEE)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Letter from Defendant Seth Levine seeking clarification on the powers granted to the Receiver. (LUBERTAZZI, JOSEPH)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Letter from Jaimee Katz Sussner, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Amended Receiver Order, #3 Exhibit A to Ex. 1 - List of Properties and Title Holders, #4 Exhibit B to Ex. 1 - Property Descriptions, #5 Exhibit C to Ex. 1 - Properties Subject to More than One Receiver Order)(SUSSNER, JAIMEE)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #14 MOTION to Intervene Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24. Motion set for 12/2/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (Ti)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by ASCEND RE PARTNERS, LLC, DSE Family Investments VII, LLC re #14 MOTION to Intervene Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24 (HERSCHMANN, ERIC)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Intervene Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24 by ASCEND RE PARTNERS, LLC, DSE Family Investments VII, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Moshael J. Straus, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(HERSCHMANN, ERIC)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC D. HERSCHMANN on behalf of ASCEND RE PARTNERS, LLC, DSE Family Investments VII, LLC (HERSCHMANN, ERIC)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS ISSUED as to 4318 KENNEDY PARTNERS, LLC, AMBOY LP VENTURES, LLC, ELIZABETH LOUISA VENTURES, LLC, SETH LEVINE, NORTH BERGEN VENTURES, LLC, PASSAIC MAIN NORSE, LLC, PAVILION NORSE, LLC, PERTH LP VENTURES, LLC, RED CLAY NORSE, LLC, RIVERSIDE NORSE, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STATUS REPORT October 2019 by COLLIERS INTERNATIONAL. (SUSSNER, JAIMEE)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by JAIMEE KATZ SUSSNER on behalf of COLLIERS INTERNATIONAL (SUSSNER, JAIMEE)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM ROBERT TELLADO on behalf of COLLIERS INTERNATIONAL (TELLADO, WILLIAM)
October 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA N. HOWLEY on behalf of COLLIERS INTERNATIONAL (HOWLEY, JOSHUA)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER appointing Sills Cummis & Gross P.C. as counsel for court appointed receiver Collier International NJ LLC pursuant to L. Civ. R. 66.1(g). Receiver is authorized to retain Sills Cummis as counsel for the Receiver in this action pursuant to L. Civ. R. 66.1(g) subject to the rates set forth in the letter from Joshua N. Howley, Esq. dated 10/9/2019 and to perform the duties set forth therein (see ECF 6). Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/10/2019. (sm)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Letter from Joshua N. Howley, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Appointing SCG as Counsel for Couort Appointed Receiver Colliers International NJ LLC)(HOWLEY, JOSHUA)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER - A Telephone Conference is set for 11/13/2019 at 2:00 pm before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Once all parties are on the phone, please call Chambers at (973) 645-3574. Status Letters are due 3 business days in advance of the conference.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/8/2019. (kd)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Telephone Conference held on 10/7/2019, on the record. (CD #ECR - 11:30.) (kd)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Receiver. COLLIERS INTERNATIONAL appointed. etc. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 9/26/2019. (dam, )
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Judgment Index Record Added Receiver COLLIERS INTERNATIONAL appointed for SETH LEVINE.(dam, ) Modified on 9/30/2019 (th).
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (eu, )
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Receiver by PRIVCAP FUNDING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order to Show Cause, #3 Text of Proposed Order fpr Receiver)(DUGGAN, TIMOTHY)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PRIVCAP FUNDING LLC identifying Privcap Funding LLC as Corporate Parent.. (DUGGAN, TIMOTHY)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 4318 KENNEDY PARTNERS, LLC, AMBOY LP VENTURES, LLC, ELIZABETH LOUISA VENTURES, LLC, SETH LEVINE, NORTH BERGEN VENTURES, LLC, PASSAIC MAIN NORSE, LLC, PAVILION NORSE, LLC, PERTH LP VENTURES, LLC, RED CLAY NORSE, LLC, RIVERSIDE NORSE, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9975144), filed by PRIVCAP FUNDING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DUGGAN, TIMOTHY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PRIVCAP FUNDING LLC v. LEVINE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH BERGEN VENTURES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIVERSIDE NORSE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SETH LEVINE
Represented By: JOSEPH E. LUBERTAZZI, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERTH LP VENTURES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PASSAIC MAIN NORSE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMBOY LP VENTURES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAVILION NORSE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RED CLAY NORSE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4318 KENNEDY PARTNERS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIZABETH LOUISA VENTURES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRIVCAP FUNDING LLC
Represented By: TIMOTHY P. DUGGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: COLLIERS INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: JOSHUA N. HOWLEY
Represented By: JAIMEE KATZ SUSSNER
Represented By: WILLIAM ROBERT TELLADO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: ASCEND RE PARTNERS, LLC
Represented By: ERIC D. HERSCHMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: DSE Family Investments VII, LLC
Represented By: ERIC D. HERSCHMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?