ESTRELLA-ROSALES et al v. TACO BELL CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: NELSON ESTRELLA-ROSALES and JOANN ESTRELLA
Defendant: YUM! BRANDS INC., (1-10), and JOHN DOES 1-10, ABC CORPORATION, TACO BELL CORPORATION, JOHN DOES 1-10 and ABC CORPORTATIONS (1-10)
Case Number: 2:2019cv18192
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Mark Falk
Referring Judge: William J Martini
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 12 STATUS REPORT / Joint Rule 26(f) Report by TACO BELL CORPORATION. (BURTON, ALLEN)
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by TACO BELL CORPORATION.(BURTON, ALLEN)
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Hannah Y. Chanoine and Carlos M. Lazatin (Corrected) by TACO BELL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allen Burton, #2 Declaration of Hannah Y. Chanoine, #3 Declaration of Carlos M. Lazatin, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(BURTON, ALLEN)
October 23, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Hannah Y. Chanoine and Carlos M. Lazatin document number 8 submitted by BURTON, ALLEN on 10/22/2019 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jd, )
October 23, 2019 Set Deadlines as to Defendant's #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Hannah Y. Chanoine and Carlos M. Lazatin. Motion set for 11/18/2019 before Judge William J. Martini. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jd, )
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #9 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Hannah Y. Chanoine and Carlos M. Lazatin (Corrected) by TACO BELL CORPORATION. etc. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 10/22/2019. (JB, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Hannah Y. Chanoine and Carlos M. Lazatin by TACO BELL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allen Burton, Esq., #2 Declaration of Hannah Y. Chanoine, #3 Declaration of Carlos M. Lazatin, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(BURTON, ALLEN)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Yum! Brands Inc. Only by JOANN ESTRELLA, NELSON ESTRELLA-ROSALES. (SCHWARTZ, DOUGLAS)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Defendant Taco Bell Corp. shall answer, move to dismiss or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before 11/1/2019. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 10/11/2019. (sm)
October 15, 2019 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #5 submitted by TACO BELL CORPORATION has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/1/2019. (sm)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION And [Proposed] Order To Extend Time To Respond To Class Action Complaint by TACO BELL CORPORATION. (BURTON, ALLEN)
September 26, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by TACO BELL CORPORATION has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/11/2019. (jd, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (BURTON, ALLEN)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW ROSS MENDELSOHN on behalf of All Plaintiffs (MENDELSOHN, MATTHEW)
September 23, 2019 Judge William J. Martini and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk added. (eu, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TACO BELL CORPORATION identifying YUM! BRANDS, INC. as Corporate Parent.. (BURTON, ALLEN)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TACO BELL CORPORATION from Superior Court of New Jersey, Middlesex County Law Division, case number MID-L-005928-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9979030), filed by TACO BELL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Affidavit, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Declaration of Jack Day, #5 Letter, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(BURTON, ALLEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ESTRELLA-ROSALES et al v. TACO BELL CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YUM! BRANDS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (1-10), and JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TACO BELL CORPORATION
Represented By: ALLEN W. BURTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORTATIONS (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NELSON ESTRELLA-ROSALES
Represented By: MATTHEW ROSS MENDELSOHN
Represented By: DOUGLAS STUART SCHWARTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOANN ESTRELLA
Represented By: MATTHEW ROSS MENDELSOHN
Represented By: DOUGLAS STUART SCHWARTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?