P&A CONSTRUCTION, INC. et al v. INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 825, AFL-CIO et al
Plaintiff: UTILITY SYSTEMS, INC. and P&A CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 825, AFL-CIO and UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY, RUBBER,MFG. ENERGY, ALLIED INDUSTRIAL AND SERVICE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 15024, AFL-CIO
Case Number: 2:2019cv18247
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Leda D Wettre
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 825, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(REGAN, RICHARD)
November 21, 2019 Filing 24 Letter re #6 MOTION Tripartite Arbitration and Stay of Arbitration . (TOBIA, RONALD)
November 21, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Telephone Conference held on 11/21/2019. (kd)
November 20, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY, RUBBER,MFG. ENERGY, ALLIED INDUSTRIAL AND SERVICE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 15024, AFL-CIO.(TYKULSKER, DAVID)
November 13, 2019 Filing 22 Letter from Ronald L. Tobia re #1 Complaint,. (TOBIA, RONALD)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to NATHAN KILBERT, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/5/2019. (ld, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 20 BRIEF in Opposition filed by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 825, AFL-CIO re #6 MOTION Tripartite Arbitration and Stay of Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate of Service)(HAZLEY, GREGORY)
October 24, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion filed by UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY, RUBBER,MFG. ENERGY, ALLIED INDUSTRIAL AND SERVICE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 15024, AFL-CIO re #6 MOTION Tripartite Arbitration and Stay of Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(TYKULSKER, DAVID)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER Defendant Local 825, during today's telephone status conference, having requested a like extension of time to respond to plaintiffs' motion as the Court had previously granted its co-defendant at ECF 15, and plaintiffs' having consented to same, the extension is hereby GRANTED until October 24, 2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/21/19. (Wettre, Leda)
October 21, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Telephone Conference held on 10/21/2019. (kd)
October 18, 2019 Filing 17 Letter from Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Local 825 Audit)(TOBIA, RONALD)
October 18, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY, RUBBER,MFG. ENERGY, ALLIED INDUSTRIAL AND SERVICE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 15024, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification of David Tykulsker, Esq., #3 Certification of Nathan Kilbert, #4 Certificate of Service)(TYKULSKER, DAVID)
October 18, 2019 Filing 14 Letter from Richard F.X. Regan, Esq. re #7 Letter. (REGAN, RICHARD)
October 18, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 11/18/2019 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER permitting Local 15024 until Thursday, October 24, 2019, to file a response to the pending motion for a stay of certain arbitrations and additional relief [Docket #6] which is returnable November 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 10/17/2019. (ld, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY J. HAZLEY on behalf of INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 825, AFL-CIO (HAZLEY, GREGORY)
October 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD F.X. REGAN on behalf of INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 825, AFL-CIO (REGAN, RICHARD)
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN BONAGURO on behalf of INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 825, AFL-CIO (BONAGURO, LAUREN)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from David Tykulsker re #6 MOTION Tripartite Arbitration and Stay of Arbitration . (TYKULSKER, DAVID)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER - A Telephone Conference is set for 10/21/2019 at 12:30 pm before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Once all parties are on the phone, please call Chambers at (973) 645-3574.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/16/2019. (kd)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by OTHIAMBA NKOSI LOVELACE on behalf of P&A CONSTRUCTION, INC., UTILITY SYSTEMS, INC. (LOVELACE, OTHIAMBA)
October 15, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION Tripartite Arbitration and Stay of Arbitration . Motion set for 11/4/2019 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
October 14, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Plaintiffs. (TOBIA, RONALD)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION Tripartite Arbitration and Stay of Arbitration by P&A CONSTRUCTION, INC., UTILITY SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Certification, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(TOBIA, RONALD)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by P&A CONSTRUCTION, INC., UTILITY SYSTEMS, INC.. UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY, RUBBER,MFG. ENERGY, ALLIED INDUSTRIAL AND SERVICE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 15024, AFL-CIO waiver sent on 9/24/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (TOBIA, RONALD)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by P&A CONSTRUCTION, INC., UTILITY SYSTEMS, INC.. INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 825, AFL-CIO waiver sent on 10/2/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (TOBIA, RONALD)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID TYKULSKER on behalf of UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY, RUBBER,MFG. ENERGY, ALLIED INDUSTRIAL AND SERVICE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 15024, AFL-CIO (TYKULSKER, DAVID)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 825, AFL-CIO, UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY, RUBBER,MFG. ENERGY, ALLIED INDUSTRIAL AND SERVICE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 15024, AFL-CIO. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (JB, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 825, AFL-CIO, UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY, RUBBER,MFG. ENERGY, ALLIED INDUSTRIAL AND SERVICE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 15024, AFL-CIO ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9982379), filed by P&A CONSTRUCTION, INC., UTILITY SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(TOBIA, RONALD)
September 23, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: P&A CONSTRUCTION, INC. et al v. INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 825, AFL-CIO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 825, AFL-CIO
Represented By: GREGORY J. HAZLEY
Represented By: LAUREN BONAGURO
Represented By: RICHARD F.X. REGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY, RUBBER,MFG. ENERGY, ALLIED INDUSTRIAL AND SERVICE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 15024, AFL-CIO
Represented By: DAVID TYKULSKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UTILITY SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: RONALD L. TOBIA
Represented By: OTHIAMBA NKOSI LOVELACE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P&A CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Represented By: RONALD L. TOBIA
Represented By: OTHIAMBA NKOSI LOVELACE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?