PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY v. TRAVIS et al
Plaintiff: PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: ERIC AND SHANA TRAVIS, GUSTAVO AND MARILYN GARCIA, THOMAS AND MELISSA PUZIO, ERIC TRAVIS, GUSTAVO GARCIA, THOMAS PUZIO, MARILYN GARCIA, MELISSA PUZIO and SHANA TRAVIS
Case Number: 2:2019cv18369
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER ORDER - A Scheduling Conference is set for 1/8/2020 at 11:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre.Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/5/2019. (kd)
November 5, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against GUSTAVO AND MARILYN GARCIA, THOMAS AND MELISSA PUZIO by ERIC AND SHANA TRAVIS.(SCHWARTZ, MICHAEL)
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against THOMAS AND MELISSA PUZIO, ERIC AND SHANA TRAVIS by GUSTAVO AND MARILYN GARCIA.(GERTLER, STEPHEN)
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY. GUSTAVO AND MARILYN GARCIA served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (ZIELINSKI, JEFFREY)
October 15, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #9 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ERIC AND SHANA TRAVIS has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/12/2019. (ld, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Eric Travis and Shana Travis. Attorney MICHAEL STEWART SCHWARTZ for ERIC AND SHANA TRAVIS added. (SCHWARTZ, MICHAEL)
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY. THOMAS AND MELISSA PUZIO served on 10/4/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. (ZIELINSKI, JEFFREY)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY. ERIC AND SHANA TRAVIS served on 10/5/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (ZIELINSKI, JEFFREY)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to GUSTAVO AND MARILYN GARCIA, THOMAS AND MELISSA PUZIO, ERIC AND SHANA TRAVIS. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
September 26, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Summons to be Issued by PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY as to THOMAS AND MELISSA PUZIO. (ZIELINSKI, JEFFREY)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Summons to be Issued by PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY as to GUSTAVO AND MARILYN GARCIA. (ZIELINSKI, JEFFREY)
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Summons to be Issued by PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY as to ERIC AND SHANA TRAVIS. (ZIELINSKI, JEFFREY)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY identifying TOKIO MARINE as Corporate Parent.. (ZIELINSKI, JEFFREY)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GUSTAVO AND MARILYN GARCIA, THOMAS AND MELISSA PUZIO, ERIC AND SHANA TRAVIS ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9989913) with JURY DEMAND, filed by PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY.(ZIELINSKI, JEFFREY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY v. TRAVIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC AND SHANA TRAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GUSTAVO AND MARILYN GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS AND MELISSA PUZIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC TRAVIS
Represented By: MICHAEL STEWART SCHWARTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GUSTAVO GARCIA
Represented By: STEPHEN E. GERTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS PUZIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARILYN GARCIA
Represented By: STEPHEN E. GERTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELISSA PUZIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHANA TRAVIS
Represented By: MICHAEL STEWART SCHWARTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JEFFREY M. ZIELINSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?