Pacheco Uzho v. McAleena et al
Petitioner: Juan Manual Pacheco Uzho
Respondent: H.O. THOMAS DECKER, WILLIAM P. BARR, Kevin McAleena and RONALD EDWARDS
Case Number: 2:2019cv18559
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-07152. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 27, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of New Jersey (ama)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, 28 U.S.C. 2241: granting #6 Motion to Dismiss; granting #6 Motion to Transfer Case. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court immediately transfer this case to the District of New Jersey, without further delay. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to Petitioner and note mailing on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/27/2019) (ama) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 PRO SE MEMORANDUM(Letter), dated 9/10/19 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Juan Manual Pacheco Uzho. New Address: #A 205826189, Etowah County Jail/Detention, 827 Forrest Ave., Gadsden, AL, 35901. (sc)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion served on Juan Manual Pacheco Uzho on 8/29/19. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by William P. Barr, Thomas Decker, Ronald Edwards, Kevin McAleena. (Kahane, Joshua)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Supervisory Detention and Deportation Officer Marc Goffman in Support re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss . MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of New Jersey.. Document filed by William P. Barr, Thomas Decker, Ronald Edwards, Kevin McAleena. (Kahane, Joshua)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss . MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of New Jersey. . Document filed by William P. Barr, Thomas Decker, Ronald Edwards, Kevin McAleena. (Kahane, Joshua)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss ., MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of New Jersey. Document filed by William P. Barr, Thomas Decker, Ronald Edwards, Kevin McAleena.(Kahane, Joshua)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Evan Kahane on behalf of William P. Barr, Thomas Decker, Ronald Edwards, Kevin McAleena. (Kahane, Joshua)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Juan Manual Pacheco Uzho ID No. 329234, at Hudson County Correctional Facility/ICE 30-35 Hackensack Ave Kearny, NJ 07032, on 8/9/2019 Re: #3 Order to Answer, via REGULAR MAIL. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (bwa)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO ANSWER, 28 U.S.C. 2241: The Court, having examined the petition in this action, which Petitioner filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, hereby ORDERS that: The Clerk of Court shall electronically notify the Civil Division of the U.S. Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York that this Order has been issued. Within twenty-one days of the date of this order, the U.S. Attorney's Office shall file an answer or other pleadings in response to the petition. Petitioner may file reply papers, if any, within fourteen days from the date Petitioner is served with Respondent's answer. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to Petitioner and note mailing on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/08/2019) (ama) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
August 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
August 8, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
August 1, 2019 Pro Se Payment of Fee Processed: $5.00 Check processed by the Finance Department on 7/31/19, Receipt Number 465401241065. (vf)
July 29, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Document filed by Juan Manual Pacheco Uzho. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacheco Uzho v. McAleena et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: H.O. THOMAS DECKER
Represented By: Joshua Evan Kahane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR
Represented By: Joshua Evan Kahane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleena
Represented By: Joshua Evan Kahane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RONALD EDWARDS
Represented By: Joshua Evan Kahane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Juan Manual Pacheco Uzho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?