PENNSYLVANIA NATIONAL MUTUAL CASUALTY INSURANCE CO. v. VITAL AIR SYSTEMS
Plaintiff: PENNSYLVANIA NATIONAL MUTUAL CASUALTY INSURANCE CO.
Defendant: VITAL AIR SYSTEMS
Case Number: 2:2019cv18612
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Steven C Mannion
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 submitted by VITAL AIR SYSTEMS has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/23/2019 (Per Chambers approval). (sm)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Vital Air Systems, Inc... (LEONE, JOSEPH)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: Our records indicate that proof of service has been filed in this civil action and that the time for defendants to answer has expired. You are hereby directed to move this civil action by requesting that a default and defendant judgment be entered or submitting an extension to Answer out of time within fourteen (14) days from the date hereof. Should you fail to do so, this action shall be listed for dismissal on December 3, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 11/19/2019. (lr, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PENNSYLVANIA NATIONAL MUTUAL CASUALTY INSURANCE CO.. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(BOYD, RICHARD)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to VITAL AIR SYSTEMS. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jd, )
October 2, 2019 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion added. (ps, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by PENNSYLVANIA NATIONAL MUTUAL CASUALTY INSURANCE CO.. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10007289) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(BOYD, RICHARD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PENNSYLVANIA NATIONAL MUTUAL CASUALTY INSURANCE CO. v. VITAL AIR SYSTEMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PENNSYLVANIA NATIONAL MUTUAL CASUALTY INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: RICHARD JAY BOYD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VITAL AIR SYSTEMS
Represented By: JOSEPH VINCENT LEONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?