NITTA v. SUNRISE CREDIT SERVICES, INC.
Plaintiff: Takahito Nitta
Defendant: SUNRISE CREDIT SERVICES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv18639
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Katharine S Hayden
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TAKAHITO NITTA. SUNRISE CREDIT SERVICES, INC. served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019. (SANDERS, CRAIG)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to SUNRISE CREDIT SERVICES, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
October 3, 2019 Judge Katharine S. Hayden and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (ps, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SUNRISE CREDIT SERVICES, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10008245) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TAKAHITO NITTA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(SANDERS, CRAIG). (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/3/2019) (ld). (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/3/2019) (ld). (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/3/2019) (ld). (Attachment 3 replaced on 10/3/2019) (ld).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NITTA v. SUNRISE CREDIT SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Takahito Nitta
Represented By: CRAIG B. SANDERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNRISE CREDIT SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?