MORRISON v. SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: KENDALL MORRISON
Defendant: SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC., PORT AUTHORITY OF NEW YORK AND NEW JERSEY, JOHN DOES 1-10 (SAID NAMES BEING FICTITIOUS, REAL NAMES UNKNOWN) and ABC COMPANIES 1-10 (said names being fictitious, real names unknown)
Case Number: 2:2019cv18743
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by KENDALL MORRISON re #5 MOTION to Remand (VLASAC, JOHN)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC. re #5 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Certification, #8 Declaration)(LEFLAND, MARISSA)
November 1, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 12/2/2019 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-4)(VLASAC, JOHN)
October 7, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ps, )
October 7, 2019 Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (ps, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC..(LEFLAND, MARISSA)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of OF HEATHER L. JACKSON FOR NOTICE OF REMOVAL re #1 Notice of Removal,, by SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC.. (LEFLAND, MARISSA)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC. identifying FMR LLC as Corporate Parent.. (LEFLAND, MARISSA)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC. from SUPERIOR COURT ESSEX COUNTY, case number ESX L 005524 19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10015799), filed by SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Morrison v Spirit Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - NY NJ Port Authority, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Claim, #4 Exhibit D - Morrison Affidavit of Service on Spirit July 31, 2019, #5 Exhibit E - Morrison Affidavit of Service on Spirit Aug 2, 2019, #6 Exhibit F - Morrison Affidavit of Service on the Port Authority, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Affidavit)(LEFLAND, MARISSA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MORRISON v. SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC.
Represented By: MARISSA NICOLE LEFLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PORT AUTHORITY OF NEW YORK AND NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10 (SAID NAMES BEING FICTITIOUS, REAL NAMES UNKNOWN)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC COMPANIES 1-10 (said names being fictitious, real names unknown)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENDALL MORRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?