NJ BUILDING LABORERS STATEWIDE BENEFIT FUNDS AND THE TRUSTEES THEREOF v. INNOVATIVE DESIGN & DEVELOPMENT
Petitioner: NJ BUILDING LABORERS STATEWIDE BENEFIT FUNDS AND THE TRUSTEES THEREOF
Respondent: INNOVATIVE DESIGN & DEVELOPMENT
Case Number: 2:2019cv18903
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Edward S Kiel
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 JUDGMENT in favor of NJ BUILDING LABORERS STATEWIDE BENEFIT FUNDS AND THE TRUSTEES THEREOF in the amount of $369,666.85 against INNOVATIVE DESIGN & DEVELOPMENT ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 11/18/2019. (sm)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 11/18/2019. (sm)
October 15, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #2 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration award . Motion set for 11/4/2019 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, )
October 11, 2019 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (ps, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NJ BUILDING LABORERS STATEWIDE BENEFIT FUNDS AND THE TRUSTEES THEREOF. (PARSONS, BRADLEY)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration award by NJ BUILDING LABORERS STATEWIDE BENEFIT FUNDS AND THE TRUSTEES THEREOF. (Attachments: #1 STATEMENT, #2 ORDER, #3 JUDGMENT, #4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(PARSONS, BRADLEY)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10030823.), filed by NJ BUILDING LABORERS STATEWIDE BENEFIT FUNDS AND THE TRUSTEES THEREOF. (Attachments: #1 COVER LETTER, #2 CIVIL COVER SHEET)(PARSONS, BRADLEY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NJ BUILDING LABORERS STATEWIDE BENEFIT FUNDS AND THE TRUSTEES THEREOF v. INNOVATIVE DESIGN & DEVELOPMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: INNOVATIVE DESIGN & DEVELOPMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NJ BUILDING LABORERS STATEWIDE BENEFIT FUNDS AND THE TRUSTEES THEREOF
Represented By: BRADLEY MARK PARSONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?