QUINOUNES v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: BELKIS QUINOUNES
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 2:2019cv19069
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from Commissioner pursuant to LR 9.1. (FAZEKAS, COREY)
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT of Primary Issues and Certificate of Service by BELKIS QUINOUNES. (ELLIS, MARYJEAN)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 Administrative Record Filed - Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8, #8 Part 9, #9 Part 10, #10 Part 11)(FAZEKAS, COREY)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by COREY STEPHEN FAZEKAS on behalf of COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (FAZEKAS, COREY)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BELKIS QUINOUNES (ELLIS, MARYJEAN)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
October 18, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Karl Osterhout. Motion set for 11/18/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Karl Osterhout by BELKIS QUINOUNES. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Applicant, #2 Index A-CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #3 Exhibit B-SUPPLEMENTAL LIST OF COURT ADMISSIONS, #4 Certificate of Service)(ELLIS, MARYJEAN)
October 17, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. (jr)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10041879), filed by BELKIS QUINOUNES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ELLIS, MARYJEAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: QUINOUNES v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Represented By: COREY STEPHEN FAZEKAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BELKIS QUINOUNES
Represented By: MARYJEAN ELLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?