GILBERTI v. AMEC FOSTER WHEELER USA CORP. et al
Plaintiff: STEPHEN GILBERTI
Defendant: AMEC FOSTER WHEELER USA CORP., JOHN DOES 1-10 and ABC CORPS 1-10
Case Number: 2:2019cv19117
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, M. REBECCA COOPER, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
December 1, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, RACHEL E. LINZY, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice M. Rebecca Cooper to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Rachel E. Linzy to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 2/13/2020 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Amended Pleadings due by 2/3/2020. Fact Discovery due by 6/1/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 2/3/2020.;etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/26/2019. (ld, )
November 22, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Scheduling Conference held on 11/22/2019. (kd)
November 21, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW041162 for RACHEL E. LINZY, ESQ. (ld, )
November 21, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW041162 for M. REBECCA COOPER, ESQ. (ld, ).
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 Joint Discovery Plan by AMEC FOSTER WHEELER USA CORP..(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION of RACHEL E. LINZY, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/4/2019. (ld, )
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION of M. REBECCA COOPER, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/4/2019. (ld, )
November 2, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Letter Seeking Pro Hac Vice on Consent by AMEC FOSTER WHEELER USA CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Certification Cert. of Local Counsel - LRodriguez - M. Rebecca Cooper, #2 Certification Cert. of M. Rebecca Cooper, #3 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order - M. Rebecca Cooper, #4 Certification Cert. of Local Counsel LRodriguez - RLinzy, #5 Certification Cert. of Rachel Linzy, #6 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order - RLinzy)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER ORDER - A Scheduling Conference is set for 11/22/2019 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre.Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/28/2019. (kd)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 Defendant ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by AMEC FOSTER WHEELER USA CORP..(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMEC FOSTER WHEELER USA CORP. identifying Amec Foster Wheeler USA Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
October 22, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (ld, )
October 18, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMEC FOSTER WHEELER PLC v Stephen Gilberti from Superior Court of NJ Essex County, case number ESX-L-006816-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10045105), filed by AMEC FOSTER WHEELER PLC.(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GILBERTI v. AMEC FOSTER WHEELER USA CORP. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMEC FOSTER WHEELER USA CORP.
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN GILBERTI
Represented By: ALAN JOSEPH GENITEMPO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?