THOMAS et al v. DECKER et al
Petitioner: YUSUF RAHEEM, NATA S. BOB and KENNETH THOMAS
Respondent: Medical Defendants (John Doe), H.O. THOMAS DECKER and Hudson County Corrections & Rehabilitation (Jail) Warden
Case Number: 2:2019cv19302
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall send Plaintiff the form entitled AO239 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, a blank civil rights complaint form and a form entitled AO 242 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; within 30 days of the date of this Order, Petitioner/Plaintiff shall advise the Court whether he wishes to proceed with a habeas or civil rights case; the Court of the Court shall Administratively Terminate this matter; the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Order upon Petitioner/Plaintiff via regular mail. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 11/19/2019. (sm, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Yusuf Raheem re: change of address dated 11/8/2019. (sm)
October 25, 2019 Judge Brian R. Martinotti added. (ps, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-08226. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 17, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (rjm)
October 17, 2019 Mailed a copy of #4 Order, Add and Terminate Parties, to Kenneth Thomas A# 306-805-567 ID No. 336856 Hudson County Corrections 30-35 Hackensack Ave. Kearny, NJ 07032. (vba)
October 17, 2019 Mailed a copy of #5 Order, to Kenneth Thomas A# 306-805-567 ID No. 336856 Hudson County Corrections 30-35 Hackensack Ave. Kearny, NJ 07032. (vba)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TRANSFER ORDER. In the interest of justice, this Court transfers this petition to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. See 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Petitioner, and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. This order closes the case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/17/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Petitioner, and note service on the docket. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to sever the claims of Petitioners Nata Bob and Yusuf Raheem and open each as a new civil action under 28 U.S.C. 2241. Petitioner Kenneth Thomas's claims will proceed in the action under docket number 19-CV-8226 (CM). Because the petition at this time makes no substantial showing of a denial of a constitutional right, a certificate of appealability will not issue. See 28 U.S.C. 2253. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this as a "written opinion" within the meaning of Section 205(a)(5) of the E-Government Act of 2002. Nata S. Bob and Yusuf Raheem terminated. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/15/2019) (tro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
October 1, 2019 Pro Se Payment of Fee Processed: $5.00 Money Order processed by the Finance Department on 9/27/2019, Receipt Number 465401245312. (jkr)
October 1, 2019 Received returned mail re: #3 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application,. Mail was addressed to Nata S. Bob A#073-650-165 ID No. 336891 Hudson County Corrections 30-35 Hackensack Ave. Kearny, NJ 07032 and was returned for the following reason(s): Return to Sender Other TOT/ICE 8/20/2019. (vba)
September 10, 2019 Mailed a copy of #3 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application, to Kenneth Thomas A# 306-805-567 ID No. 336856 Hudson County Corrections 30-35 Hackensack Ave. Kearny, NJ 07032 ; Nata S. Bob A#073-650-165 ID No. 336891 Hudson County Corrections 30-35 Hackensack Ave. Kearny, NJ 07032 ; and to Yusuf Raheem A# 099-309-120 ID No. 324004 Hudson County Corrections 30-35 Hackensack Ave. Kearny, NJ 07032. (aea)
September 10, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 10/10/2019. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 10/10/2019. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/10/2019) (Attachments: #1 IFP application)(keb) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
September 3, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION re Emergency Injunction re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Nata S. Bob, Yusuf Raheem, Kenneth Thomas. (sac)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Document filed by Nata S. Bob, Yusuf Raheem, Kenneth Thomas. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THOMAS et al v. DECKER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Medical Defendants (John Doe)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: H.O. THOMAS DECKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Hudson County Corrections & Rehabilitation (Jail) Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: YUSUF RAHEEM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NATA S. BOB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KENNETH THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?