ULTRA LOGISTICS, INC. v. CODY KEYS TRUCKING, LLC et al
Plaintiff: ULTRA LOGISTICS, INC.
Defendant: NORTHLAND INSURANCE COMPANY, CODY KEYS TRUCKING, LLC, JOHN DOE DEFENDANTS 1-10, XYZ PARTNERSHIPS AND OTHER ENTITIES 1-10 and ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Case Number: 2:2019cv19315
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Edward S Kiel
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 12/9/2019. (lag, )
December 9, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. Scheduling Conference held on 12/9/2019. (Court Reporter/Recorder None.) (as, )
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 Joint Discovery Plan by CODY KEYS TRUCKING, LLC.(MOURTZANAKIS, MICHAEL)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 LETTER ORDER: An in-person initial scheduling conference shall be held on 12/9/2019 at 2:00 PM in Newark - Courtroom 8 of the U.S. Post Office and Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The parties shall submit a proposed Joint Discovery Plan as a Word document, to ESK_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Courts form Joint Discovery Plan may be found at www.njd.uscourts.gov/content/edward-s-kiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 10/28/2019. (as, )
October 25, 2019 Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (ps, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CODY KEYS TRUCKING, LLC, NORTHLAND INSURANCE COMPANY from Superior Court of Bergen County, case number BER L 6654 19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10059104), filed by CODY KEYS TRUCKING, LLC, NORTHLAND INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(MOURTZANAKIS, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ULTRA LOGISTICS, INC. v. CODY KEYS TRUCKING, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHLAND INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: MICHAEL A. MOURTZANAKIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CODY KEYS TRUCKING, LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL A. MOURTZANAKIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE DEFENDANTS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ PARTNERSHIPS AND OTHER ENTITIES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ULTRA LOGISTICS, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL THOMAS CAULFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?