INGRAM v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Petitioner: DAWUD H. INGRAM
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2019cv19525
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to DAWUD H. INGRAM (lag, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to DAWUD H. INGRAM. (dam, )
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER administratively terminating this case, etc. Blank 2255 form sent, etc. (N/M). Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 11/5/19. (lag, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS S. KEARNEY on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (KEARNEY, THOMAS)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 Exhibit (Criminal transcript) to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), by DAWUD H. INGRAM. (lag, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 2:17-cr-502, filed by DAWUD H. INGRAM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Criminal Case Sentence refiled separately, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope)(lag, ) Modified on 11/5/2019 (lag, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INGRAM v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DAWUD H. INGRAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: JOHN GAY
Represented By: THOMAS S. KEARNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?