GIBLIN v. PERFORMANCE FOOD GROUP, INC. et al
Plaintiff: AMANDA GIBLIN
Defendant: PERFORMANCE FOOD GROUP, INC., PERFORMANCE FOODSERVICE and JOHN DOES 1-5 AND 6-10
Case Number: 2:2019cv19763
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Mark Falk
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 1/17/2020 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 9 before Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 12/20/19. (LM, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint and Separate Defenses by PERFORMANCE FOOD GROUP, INC., PERFORMANCE FOODSERVICE.(MCDONNELL, JAMES)
November 4, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #2 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by PERFORMANCE FOOD GROUP, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/22/2019. (ams, )
November 1, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. (ak, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PERFORMANCE FOOD GROUP, INC., PERFORMANCE FOODSERVICE identifying PFGC, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (MCDONNELL, JAMES)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney DANIEL T. SILVERMAN for AMANDA GIBLIN added. (MCDONNELL, JAMES)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PERFORMANCE FOOD GROUP, INC., PERFORMANCE FOODSERVICE from Superior Court of NJ Essex County, case number ESX-L-007020-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10081095), filed by PERFORMANCE FOOD GROUP, INC., PERFORMANCE FOODSERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Compliance, #3 Certificate of Service)(MCDONNELL, JAMES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GIBLIN v. PERFORMANCE FOOD GROUP, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERFORMANCE FOOD GROUP, INC.
Represented By: JAMES M. MCDONNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERFORMANCE FOODSERVICE
Represented By: JAMES M. MCDONNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-5 AND 6-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMANDA GIBLIN
Represented By: DANIEL T. SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?