TRAVELERS CASUALTY & SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: TRAVELERS CASUALTY & SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA
Defendant: Samir Patel, Dilip S. Patel, Annoj Patel, Jayesh Patel, Dilip Patel & Company, LLP and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2019cv19777
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #14 Order submitted by Jayesh Patel, Dilip S. Patel, Samir Patel, Annoj Patel, Dilip Patel & Company, LLP has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/31/2019. (lag, )
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Samir Patel, Dilip S. Patel, Jayesh Patel, Dilip Patel & Company, LLP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 12/13/2019. (lag, )
December 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Dilip Patel & Company, LLP, Dilip S. Patel, Jayesh Patel, Samir Patel. (NOVAK, THOMAS)
November 27, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Dilip Patel & Company, LLP, Dilip S. Patel, Jayesh Patel, Samir Patel. Amendment to #11 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, . (NOVAK, THOMAS)
November 27, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #11 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by Jayesh Patel, Dilip S. Patel, Samir Patel, Annoj Patel, Dilip Patel & Company, LLP has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/13/2019. (ld, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants. Attorney THOMAS STEVEN NOVAK for Dilip Patel & Company, LLP,THOMAS STEVEN NOVAK for Annoj Patel,THOMAS STEVEN NOVAK for Dilip S. Patel,THOMAS STEVEN NOVAK for Jayesh Patel,THOMAS STEVEN NOVAK for Samir Patel added. (NOVAK, THOMAS)
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by TRAVELERS CASUALTY & SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA. Annoj Patel served on 11/14/2019, answer due 12/5/2019. (FLORENTINO, PATRICK)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by TRAVELERS CASUALTY & SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA. Jayesh Patel served on 11/8/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (FLORENTINO, PATRICK)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by TRAVELERS CASUALTY & SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA. Samir Patel served on 11/8/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (FLORENTINO, PATRICK)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by TRAVELERS CASUALTY & SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA. Dilip S. Patel served on 11/8/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (FLORENTINO, PATRICK)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by TRAVELERS CASUALTY & SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA. Dilip Patel & Company, LLP served on 11/8/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (FLORENTINO, PATRICK)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM M. SMITH on behalf of TRAVELERS CASUALTY & SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA (SMITH, ADAM)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK ANTHONY FLORENTINO on behalf of TRAVELERS CASUALTY & SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA (FLORENTINO, PATRICK)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dilip Patel & Company, LLP, Annoj Patel, Dilip S. Patel, Jayesh Patel, Samir Patel. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
November 1, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (ak, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRAVELERS CASUALTY & SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA. (FLORENTINO, PATRICK)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dilip Patel & Company, LLP, Dilip S. Patel, Samir Patel, Jayesh Patel, Annoj Patel ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10081229) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TRAVELERS CASUALTY & SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Travelers Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Information, #3 Exhibit C - Plea Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Judgment, #5 Exhibit E - Consent Order)(FLORENTINO, PATRICK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRAVELERS CASUALTY & SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samir Patel
Represented By: THOMAS STEVEN NOVAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dilip S. Patel
Represented By: THOMAS STEVEN NOVAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annoj Patel
Represented By: THOMAS STEVEN NOVAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayesh Patel
Represented By: THOMAS STEVEN NOVAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dilip Patel & Company, LLP
Represented By: THOMAS STEVEN NOVAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRAVELERS CASUALTY & SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: PATRICK ANTHONY FLORENTINO
Represented By: ADAM M. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?