SPEEDWELL, LLC et al v. TOWN OF MORRISTOWN et al
Plaintiff: SPEEDWELL ASSOCIATES NO. 1, LP, SPEEDWELL ASSOCIATES NO. 4, LP and SPEEDWELL, LLC
Defendant: MORRISTOWN DEVELOPMENT LLC, TOPOLOGY NJ, LLC, TOWN OF MORRISTOWN, JOHN DOE, TIMOTHY DOUGHERTY, JOHN INGLESINO, Abramson Phil, MORRISTOWN URBAN RENEWAL PHASE II, LLC, JOHN DOES 1-10 and PHIL ABRAMSON
Case Number: 2:2019cv19820
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Katharine S Hayden
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Answer Due Deadline Update - The answer due date for MORRISTOWN DEVELOPMENT LLC, MORRISTOWN URBAN RENEWAL PHASE II, LLC has been set for 2/3/2020. (sms )
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT; The time for Defendants Morristown Development, LLC and Morristown Development Urban Renewal Phase II, LLC to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is hereby extended through and including February 3, 2020; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/2/2020. (sms)
January 2, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. Motion set for 1/21/2020 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms)
January 2, 2020 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, )
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor in courtroom 4D on 2/11/20 at 10:30am. Local counsel must be present. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/2/20. (tjg, )
December 27, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by PHIL ABRAMSON, TIMOTHY DOUGHERTY, JOHN INGLESINO, TOPOLOGY NJ, LLC, TOWN OF MORRISTOWN. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification Of Ron Israel, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(ISRAEL, RONALD)
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Matthew J. Fedor, Esq. re: Stipulation and Proposed Consent Order Extending Time for Morristown Development, LLC and Morristown Development Urban Renewal Phase II, LLC to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Proposed Consent Order)(FEDOR, MATTHEW)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Ronald Israel, Esq. re #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order,. (ISRAEL, RONALD)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: Defendants Morristown Development LLC and Morristown Urban Renewal Phase II, LLC may respond to the Complaint by January 3, 2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/23/19. (tjg, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW J. FEDOR on behalf of MORRISTOWN DEVELOPMENT LLC, MORRISTOWN URBAN RENEWAL PHASE II, LLC (FEDOR, MATTHEW)
December 11, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by PHIL ABRAMSON, TOPOLOGY NJ, LLC, MORRISTOWN DEVELOPMENT LLC, JOHN INGLESINO, TOWN OF MORRISTOWN, MORRISTOWN URBAN RENEWAL PHASE II, LLC, TIMOTHY DOUGHERTY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/27/2019. (sms)
December 10, 2019 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL for PHIL ABRAMSON,RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL for TIMOTHY DOUGHERTY,RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL for JOHN INGLESINO,RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL for MORRISTOWN DEVELOPMENT LLC,RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL for MORRISTOWN URBAN RENEWAL PHASE II, LLC,RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL for TOPOLOGY NJ, LLC,RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL for TOWN OF MORRISTOWN added. (ISRAEL, RONALD)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PHIL ABRAMSON, TIMOTHY DOUGHERTY, JOHN INGLESINO, MORRISTOWN DEVELOPMENT LLC, MORRISTOWN URBAN RENEWAL PHASE II, LLC, TOPOLOGY NJ, LLC, TOWN OF MORRISTOWN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, )
November 5, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Katharine S. Hayden and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10085005) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SPEEDWELL ASSOCIATES NO. 4, LP, SPEEDWELL ASSOCIATES NO. 1, LP, SPEEDWELL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Statement)(ROSENBACH, PHILIP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPEEDWELL, LLC et al v. TOWN OF MORRISTOWN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORRISTOWN DEVELOPMENT LLC
Represented By: RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL
Represented By: MATTHEW J. FEDOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOPOLOGY NJ, LLC
Represented By: RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF MORRISTOWN
Represented By: RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY DOUGHERTY
Represented By: RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN INGLESINO
Represented By: RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abramson Phil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORRISTOWN URBAN RENEWAL PHASE II, LLC
Represented By: RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL
Represented By: MATTHEW J. FEDOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHIL ABRAMSON
Represented By: RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPEEDWELL ASSOCIATES NO. 1, LP
Represented By: PHILIP ROSENBACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPEEDWELL ASSOCIATES NO. 4, LP
Represented By: PHILIP ROSENBACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPEEDWELL, LLC
Represented By: PHILIP ROSENBACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?