RIVERA v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: SANDY RIVERA
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL and COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 2:2019cv19917
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SANDY RIVERA. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY served on 12/13/2019, answer due 2/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 certified mail receipt)(JONES, DANIEL)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
November 6, 2019 Judge Esther Salas added. (ps, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SANDY RIVERA. (JONES, DANIEL)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10090852), filed by SANDY RIVERA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(JONES, DANIEL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RIVERA v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDY RIVERA
Represented By: DANIEL SYLVESTER JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?