D.J.C. vs. AMAZON COM DEDC, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: D.J.C.
Defendant: ABC CORPS 1-5, JANE DOE INDIVIDUALS 1-10, AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., TYLER MORALES, ABC CORPS (I-V) and AMAZON COM DEDC, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv19985
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Mark Falk
Referring Judge: William J Martini
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION by All Plaintiffs. (VENNEMAN, W.)
December 31, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION by All Plaintiffs. (VENNEMAN, W.)
December 16, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by AMAZON COM DEDC, LLC re #4 First MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment MOTION for Leave to Appeal MOTION for Leave to File MOTION to Remand TO MIDDLESEX COUNTY (HECKMAN, AUGUST)
December 10, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk: Status/Settlement Conference via telephone held on 12/10/2019. (Court Reporter/Recorder NONE.) (LM, )
December 6, 2019 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #9 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by AMAZON COM DEDC, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/30/2019. (lag, )
December 6, 2019 Filing 9 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (HECKMAN, AUGUST)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Letter request for extension of time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint and respond to plaintiff's motion for leave to amend and remand. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 12/3/2019. (lag, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by ASHLEY D. CHILTON on behalf of AMAZON COM DEDC, LLC, TYLER MORALES (CHILTON, ASHLEY)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Ashley D. Chilton, Esq. enclosing a Stipulation Extending Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint and Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order and Stipulation)(CHILTON, ASHLEY)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: There shall be a telephone conference before the Undersigned on December 10, 2019 at 4:00 p.m. Plaintiff directed to arrange for the conference call. So Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 11/20/19. (LM, )
November 19, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint; MOTION to Remand TO MIDDLESEX COUNTY. Motion set for 12/16/2019 before Judge William J. Martini. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms) Modified on 1/3/2020 (gh).
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint, MOTION to Remand TO MIDDLESEX COUNTY by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AMENDED COMPLAINT)(VENNEMAN, W.) Modified on 1/3/2020 (gh).
November 14, 2019 Clerk's Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by AMAZON COM DEDC, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/29/2019. (dam, )
November 8, 2019 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martini and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. (jr)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (HECKMAN, AUGUST)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMAZON COM DEDC, LLC(HECKMAN, AUGUST)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMAZON COM DEDC, LLC from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, MIDDLESEX COUNTY, case number MID-L-6893-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10097916), AMAZON COM DEDC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal)(HECKMAN, AUGUST) Modified on 11/14/2019 (dam, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D.J.C. vs. AMAZON COM DEDC, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPS 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE INDIVIDUALS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: AUGUST W. HECKMAN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TYLER MORALES
Represented By: ASHLEY D. CHILTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPS (I-V)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON COM DEDC, LLC
Represented By: AUGUST W. HECKMAN, III
Represented By: ASHLEY D. CHILTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.J.C.
Represented By: W. DANA VENNEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?