COHN v. SYSCO CORP. et al
Plaintiff: HEATH COHN
Defendant: XYZ CORP., ABC CORP., SYSCO CORP., BUCKHEAD BEEF COMPANY, BUCKHEAD BEEF NORTHEAST, LEWIS G HELBLING, SYSCO CORPORATION and LOUIS G. HELBLING
Case Number: 2:2019cv20013
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Steven C Mannion
Referring Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ek)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by BUCKHEAD BEEF COMPANY, BUCKHEAD BEEF NORTHEAST, LOUIS G. HELBLING, SYSCO CORPORATION.(MCDONALD, JOHN)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Scheduling Initial R16 Conference for 1/21/2020 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 12/11/2019. (spc, )
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Letter request for a two week extension to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, due 12/13/2019. Rule 16 Conference is set for 1/21/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 11/26/2019. (ams, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from John McDonald. (MCDONALD, JOHN)
November 14, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by SYSCO CORPORATION, BUCKHEAD BEEF NORTHEAST, BUCKHEAD BEEF COMPANY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/29/2019. (ams, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants Sysco Corporation, Buckhead Beef Company and Buckhead Beef Northeast.. (MCDONALD, JOHN)
November 8, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. (jr)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BUCKHEAD BEEF COMPANY, BUCKHEAD BEEF NORTHEAST, SYSCO CORP. identifying SYSCO as Corporate Parent.. (MCDONALD, JOHN)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SYSCO CORP., BUCKHEAD BEEF NORTHEAST, BUCKHEAD BEEF COMPANY from ESSEX COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, case number ESX-L-7245-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10099741), filed by SYSCO CORP., BUCKHEAD BEEF NORTHEAST, BUCKHEAD BEEF COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Declaration, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCDONALD, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COHN v. SYSCO CORP. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYSCO CORP.
Represented By: JOHN THOMAS MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUCKHEAD BEEF COMPANY
Represented By: JOHN THOMAS MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUCKHEAD BEEF NORTHEAST
Represented By: JOHN THOMAS MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEWIS G HELBLING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYSCO CORPORATION
Represented By: JOHN THOMAS MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUIS G. HELBLING
Represented By: JOHN THOMAS MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEATH COHN
Represented By: LISA MANSHEL
Represented By: MAUREEN BINETTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?