MATTHEWS v. BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: ANNABELL MATTHEWS
Defendant: ABC CORP 1-3, BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION and BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv20108
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission of Angela A. Smedley. Motion set for 2/3/2020 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 13 BRIEF in Opposition filed by BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION, BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION re #4 MOTION to Remand (SAYDAH, HEATHER)
January 7, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission of Angela A. Smedley by BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION, BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Angela A. Smedley, #2 Certification of Heather Elizabeth Saydah, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(SAYDAH, HEATHER)
January 7, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission of Kobi Kennedy Brinson, #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission of Ross J. Corbett. Motion set for 2/3/2020 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission of Kobi Kennedy Brinson by BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION, BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Kobi Kennedy Brinson, #2 Certification of Heather Elizabeth Saydah, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(SAYDAH, HEATHER)
January 6, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission of Ross J. Corbett by BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION, BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Ross J. Corbett, #2 Certification of Heather Elizabeth Saydah, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(SAYDAH, HEATHER)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Rule 7.1. Resetting Hearing on #4 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand. Motion reset for 1/21/2020 before Judge Esther Salas. etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 12/20/2019.(dam, )
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #4 MOTION to Remand . (SAYDAH, HEATHER)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2020 at 10:30 a.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 1/24/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/10/2019. (jqb, ) Modified on 12/10/2019 (jqb, ).
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION, BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION re #3 MOTION to Dismiss (SAYDAH, HEATHER)
December 5, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 1/6/2020 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #3 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(UYAMADU, JOHN)
November 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Brief, #3 Declaration and Exhibits, #4 Certification and Appendix, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(UYAMADU, JOHN)
November 21, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 12/16/2019 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt, )
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION, BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. Responses due by 12/2/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(SAYDAH, HEATHER)
November 13, 2019 Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (ps, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION, BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION identifying BANA Holding Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (SAYDAH, HEATHER)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION, BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION from Superior Court of New Jersey, Hudson County, case number HUD L 003905 19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10105011), filed by BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION, BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summonses, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(SAYDAH, HEATHER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MATTHEWS v. BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORP 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION
Represented By: HEATHER ELIZABETH SAYDAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: HEATHER ELIZABETH SAYDAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNABELL MATTHEWS
Represented By: JOHN CHUKWUNWE UYAMADU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?