JACOBOWITZ v. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC et al
Plaintiff: NAFTALI JACOBOWITZ
Defendant: EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC, BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE, DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES INC., SANTANDER CONSUMER USA INC., AMERICAN HONDA FINANCE CORPORATION and TRANSUNION LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv20120
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Edward S Kiel
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #20 submitted by BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/3/2020. (sms)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER; granting #20 Defendants' Barclays Bank Delaware letter request for an extension of time in which Barclays may respond to the Complaint filed by Plaintiff Naftali Jacobowitz to February 3, 2020; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 1/3/2020. (sms)
January 3, 2020 Filing 20 Letter from Greyson K. Van Dyke re #1 Complaint,. (VAN DYKE, GREYSON)
January 3, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by GREYSON KYLE VAN DYKE on behalf of BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE (VAN DYKE, GREYSON)
January 3, 2020 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN HONDA FINANCE CORPORATION identifying Honda Motor Co., Ltd. as Corporate Parent.. (KORNBREK, CLIFFORD)
January 3, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by AMERICAN HONDA FINANCE CORPORATION.(KORNBREK, CLIFFORD)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 LETTER ORDER: An in-person initial scheduling conference shall be held on 2/6/2020 at 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 8 of the U.S. Post Office and Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The parties shall submit a proposed Joint Discovery Plan as a Word document, to ESK_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Courts form Joint Discovery Plan may be found at www.njd.uscourts.gov/content/edward-s-kiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 12/27/2019. (as, )
December 27, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(REILEY, WILLIAM)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSENT ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT; The time within which Discover, shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended up to and including Thursday, January 2, 2020; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 12/20/2019. (sms)
December 20, 2019 Filing 13 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Complaint.. (REILEY, WILLIAM)
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM PATRICK REILEY on behalf of DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES INC. (REILEY, WILLIAM)
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 TRANS UNION, LLC'S ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by TRANSUNION LLC.(BROWN, WILLIAM)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NAFTALI JACOBOWITZ. TRANSUNION LLC served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (SAKS, YAAKOV)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NAFTALI JACOBOWITZ. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (SAKS, YAAKOV)
December 19, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #8 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by AMERICAN HONDA FINANCE CORPORATION has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/9/2019. (sms)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to American Honda Finance Corporation. Attorney CLIFFORD BRIAN KORNBREK for AMERICAN HONDA FINANCE CORPORATION added. (KORNBREK, CLIFFORD)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NAFTALI JACOBOWITZ. DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES INC. served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (SAKS, YAAKOV)
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRANSUNION LLC. (BROWN, WILLIAM)
December 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM ROBERT BROWN on behalf of TRANSUNION LLC (BROWN, WILLIAM)
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NAFTALI JACOBOWITZ. BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (SAKS, YAAKOV)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by NAFTALI JACOBOWITZ. SANTANDER CONSUMER USA INC. waiver sent on 11/20/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (SAKS, YAAKOV)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMERICAN HONDA FINANCE CORPORATION, BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE, DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES INC., EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC, SANTANDER CONSUMER USA INC., TRANSUNION LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, )
November 13, 2019 Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (ps, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMERICAN HONDA FINANCE CORPORATION, BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE, DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES INC., EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC, SANTANDER CONSUMER USA INC., TRANSUNION LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10106626) with JURY DEMAND, filed by NAFTALI JACOBOWITZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SAKS, YAAKOV)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JACOBOWITZ v. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE
Represented By: GREYSON KYLE VAN DYKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM PATRICK REILEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANTANDER CONSUMER USA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN HONDA FINANCE CORPORATION
Represented By: CLIFFORD BRIAN KORNBREK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANSUNION LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM ROBERT BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAFTALI JACOBOWITZ
Represented By: YAAKOV SAKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?