SPEEDPAY, INC. v. BILLGO, INC.
Plaintiff: SPEEDPAY, INC.
Defendant: BILLGO, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv20274
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Edward S Kiel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 LETTER ORDER: The in-person initial scheduling conference scheduled for 1/27/2020 is rescheduled to 2/11/2020 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 8 of the U.S. Post Office and Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The parties shall submit a proposed Joint Discovery Plan as a Word document, to ESK_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Courts form Joint Discovery Plan may be found at www.njd.uscourts.gov/content/edward-s-kiel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 1/3/2020. (as, )
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Consent Application for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. The deadline for Plaintiff SPEEDPAY, INC. to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is extended to and including 2/3/2020. etc. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 1/2/2020. (dam, )
January 2, 2020 Filing 16 Letter from jennifer Del Medico. (DEL MEDICO, JENNIFER)
January 2, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #15 Consent Application for Extension of Time to Respond filed by JENNIFER DEL MEDICO submitted incorrectly as a MOTION. For future reference, please refer to the event "Application/Petition," which can be found under "Civil Events, "Other Filings," and "Other Documents." This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dam, )
December 31, 2019 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by SPEEDPAY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DEL MEDICO, JENNIFER)
December 23, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #14 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 1/21/2020 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by BILLGO, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(KRAMER, JENNY)
December 20, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by BILLGO, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dan Holt, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Certificate of Service)(KRAMER, JENNY)
December 18, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #12 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Millard A. Johnson and Sara J. Sherman. Motion set for 1/21/2020 before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Millard A. Johnson and Sara J. Sherman by SPEEDPAY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jennifer L. Del Medico, #2 Certification of Millard A. Johnson, #3 Certification of Sara J. Sherman, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(DEL MEDICO, JENNIFER)
December 16, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #11 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lara C. Tumeh, and #10 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher A. Riley. Motions set for 1/6/2020 before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
December 13, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lara C. Tumeh by BILLGO, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lara C. Tumeh, #2 Declaration of Jenny Kramer, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(KRAMER, JENNY)
December 13, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher A. Riley by BILLGO, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher A. Riley, #2 Declaration of Jenny Kramer, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(KRAMER, JENNY)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LETTER ORDER: An in-person initial scheduling conference shall be held on 1/27/2020 at 3:00 PM in Newark - Courtroom 8 of the U.S. Post Office and Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The parties shall submit a proposed Joint Discovery Plan as a Word document, to ESK_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Courts form Joint Discovery Plan may be found at www.njd.uscourts.gov/content/edward-s-kiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 12/9/2019. (as, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by READE WILLIAM SELIGMANN on behalf of BILLGO, INC. (SELIGMANN, READE)
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNY R. KRAMER on behalf of BILLGO, INC. (KRAMER, JENNY)
November 23, 2019 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT by SPEEDPAY, INC.. (DEL MEDICO, JENNIFER)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Status Conference call held in Chambers on 11/14/2019 regarding TRO. (jl, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BILLGO, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 Local Civil Rule 11.2 Certification on behalf of SPEEDPAY, INC. (dam, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SPEEDPAY, INC. (dam, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BILLGO, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number NEW041077), filed by SPEEDPAY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Letter regarding Order to Show Cause, #3 Brief in Support of Injunctive Relief, #4 Affidavit of Daniel Frate in Support of Plaintiff's Application for TRO and Preliminary Injunction, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons)(dam, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPEEDPAY, INC. v. BILLGO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BILLGO, INC.
Represented By: READE WILLIAM SELIGMANN
Represented By: JENNY R. KRAMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPEEDPAY, INC.
Represented By: JENNIFER LYNN DEL MEDICO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?