COOPERWOOD CAPITAL LLC v. HEALTH STREAM LLC
Plaintiff: COOPERWOOD CAPITAL LLC
Defendant: HEALTH STREAM LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv20387
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Leda D Wettre
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (dam, )
January 7, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #4 Return of Service filed by N. BENCZE on 1/6/2020 was submitted incorrectly as a Certificate of Service. For future reference, if filing a Return of Service or Affidavit of Service indicating the date of service of the Summons and the Complaint, do NOT use this event. The correct event is SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. This message is for informational purposes only, and there is no further action required. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dam, )
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by COOPERWOOD CAPITAL LLC re #1 Complaint. HEALTH STREAM, LLC served on 12/23/2019. Answer due 1/13/2020. (BENCZE, NOLA) Modified on 1/7/2020 (dam).
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to HEALTH STREAM LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by COOPERWOOD CAPITAL LLC as to HEALTH STREAM LLC. (BENCZE, NOLA)
November 15, 2019 Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (ps, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Health Stream LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10115321), filed by Copperwood Capital LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(BENCZE, NOLA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COOPERWOOD CAPITAL LLC v. HEALTH STREAM LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEALTH STREAM LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COOPERWOOD CAPITAL LLC
Represented By: NOLA R. BENCZE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?