CASTRO v. LINDEN BULK TRANSPORTATION LLC et al
Plaintiff: WERNY CASTRO
Defendant: LINDEN BULK TRANSPORTATION LLC, ODYSSEY LOGISTICS & TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION, Linden Logistics Company Inc., LBT SERVICES LLC, LINDEN TRANSPORTATION INTERNATIONAL, LLC, ODYSSEY LBT LLC, LINDEN BULK TRANSPORTATION CO., LBT INTERMODAL LLC,, LINDEN LOGISTICS COMPANY, M&S 3 Holdings LLC, LINDEN MOTOR FREIGHT CO., M&S Leasing Holding Company LLC, M&S LEASING CO. II LLC, ODYSSEY LOGISTICS & TECHNOLOGY CORP., M&S LEASING CO., L.L.C, LINDEN TRANSPORTATION INTERNATIONAL, LBT INTERMODAL LLC, JOHN/JANE DOES 1-10, ABC CORPS. 1-10 and Linden Bulk Transportation Co., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv20442
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Leda D Wettre
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by WERNY CASTRO re #8 MOTION to Remand to New Jersey State Court (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anthony S. Almeida, Esq., #2 Exhibit A and B to Declaration)(ALMEIDA, ANTHONY)
December 26, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #14 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Motion set for 2/3/2020 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
December 24, 2019 Filing 15 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by WERNY CASTRO re #14 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint New Return Date: 2/3/2020; Opposition Due: 1/21/2020; Reply Due: 1/27/2020 (ALMEIDA, ANTHONY)
December 23, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by LINDEN BULK TRANSPORTATION LLC, ODYSSEY LBT LLC. Responses due by 1/7/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(BERK, PETER)
December 23, 2019 Filing 13 BRIEF in Opposition filed by LBT INTERMODAL LLC,, LBT SERVICES LLC, LINDEN BULK TRANSPORTATION LLC, LINDEN TRANSPORTATION INTERNATIONAL, LLC, Linden Bulk Transportation Co., Inc., Linden Logistics Company Inc., M&S 3 Holdings LLC, M&S LEASING CO. II LLC, M&S LEASING CO., L.L.C, M&S Leasing Holding Company LLC, ODYSSEY LBT LLC, ODYSSEY LOGISTICS & TECHNOLOGY CORP. re #8 MOTION to Remand to New Jersey State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration of Joe Liuzzo, #2 Exhibit B Declaration of M. McCunney, #3 Exhibit Dec. of M. McCunney cont., #4 Exhibit Dec. of M. McCunney cont., #5 Exhibit Dec. of M. McCunney cont., #6 Exhibit Dec. of M. McCunney cont., #7 Exhibit Dec. of M. McCunney cont., #8 Exhibit Dec. of M. McCunney cont., #9 Exhibit Dec. of M. McCunney cont., #10 Exhibit Dec. of M. McCunney cont., #11 Exhibit Dec. of M. McCunney cont., #12 Exhibit Dec. of M. McCunney cont., #13 Exhibit Dec. of M. McCunney cont., #14 Exhibit Dec. of M. McCunney cont., #15 Exhibit Dec. of M. McCunney cont., #16 Exhibit Dec. of M. McCunney cont., #17 Exhibit Dec. of M. McCunney cont., #18 Exhibit Dec. of M. McCunney cont., #19 Exhibit Dec. of M. McCunney cont., #20 Exhibit Dec. of M. McCunney cont., #21 Exhibit Dec. of M. McCunney cont., #22 Exhibit Dec. of M. McCunney cont., #23 Exhibit Dec. of M. McCunney cont., #24 Exhibit Dec. of M. McCunney cont., #25 Exhibit Dec. of M. McCunney cont., #26 Exhibit Dec. of M. McCunney cont., #27 Exhibit Dec. of M. McCunney cont., #28 Exhibit Dec. of M. McCunney cont., #29 Exhibit Dec. of M. McCunney cont., #30 Exhibit Dec. of M. McCunney cont., #31 Exhibit Dec. of M. McCunney cont., #32 Exhibit Dec. of M. McCunney cont., #33 Exhibit Dec. of M. McCunney cont., #34 Exhibit C, #35 Exhibit D)(BERK, PETER)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Letter requesting to withdraw Motion to Dismiss; Motions terminated: #6 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 12/23/2019. (ams, )
December 23, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, ANDREW J. BUTCHER, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (JB, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Andrew J. Butcher re #6 MOTION to Dismiss . (BERK, PETER)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Andrew J. Butcher, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (BERK, PETER)
December 19, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee as to Andrew Butcher: $ 150, receipt number NEW041408 (sm)
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT Class Action and Jury Trial Demand against LINDEN BULK TRANSPORTATION LLC, filed by WERNY CASTRO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(SATTIRAJU, RAVI)
December 5, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Remand to New Jersey State Court, #6 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 1/6/2020 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to New Jersey State Court by WERNY CASTRO. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support Of Remand, #2 Text of Proposed Order Of Remand)(ALMEIDA, ANTHONY)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION. #4 Letter Request is granted for Andrew Butcher to appear pro hac vice in this matter, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/26/19. (jc, ) Modified on 11/26/2019 (jc, ).
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by LBT SERVICES LLC, LINDEN BULK TRANSPORTATION LLC, ODYSSEY LOGISTICS & TECHNOLOGY CORP., Linden Bulk Transportation Co., Inc., LBT INTERMODAL LLC,, M&S LEASING CO., L.L.C, M&S LEASING CO. II LLC, ODYSSEY LBT LLC, LINDEN TRANSPORTATION INTERNATIONAL, LLC, Linden Logistics Company Inc., M&S Leasing Holding Company LLC, M&S 3 Holdings LLC. Responses due by 1/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(BERK, PETER)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LINDEN BULK TRANSPORTATION LLC, ODYSSEY LOGISTICS & TECHNOLOGY CORP. identifying see attached as Corporate Parent.. (BERK, PETER)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Peter F. Berk. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Andrew Butcher, Esq., #2 Certification of Peter F. Berk, Esq, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(BERK, PETER)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by RAVI SATTIRAJU on behalf of WERNY CASTRO (SATTIRAJU, RAVI)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY SANTOS ALMEIDA on behalf of WERNY CASTRO (ALMEIDA, ANTHONY)
November 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (ak, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LINDEN BULK TRANSPORTATION LLC, ODYSSEY LOGISTICS & TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION from ESSEX SUPERIOR COURT, case number ESX-L-6141-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10119431), filed by LINDEN BULK TRANSPORTATION LLC, ODYSSEY LOGISTICS & TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXH.A, #2 Exhibit EXH. B)(BERK, PETER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CASTRO v. LINDEN BULK TRANSPORTATION LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDEN BULK TRANSPORTATION LLC
Represented By: PETER FRANCIS BERK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ODYSSEY LOGISTICS & TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION
Represented By: PETER FRANCIS BERK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linden Logistics Company Inc.
Represented By: PETER FRANCIS BERK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LBT SERVICES LLC
Represented By: PETER FRANCIS BERK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDEN TRANSPORTATION INTERNATIONAL, LLC
Represented By: PETER FRANCIS BERK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ODYSSEY LBT LLC
Represented By: PETER FRANCIS BERK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDEN BULK TRANSPORTATION CO.
Represented By: PETER FRANCIS BERK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LBT INTERMODAL LLC,
Represented By: PETER FRANCIS BERK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDEN LOGISTICS COMPANY
Represented By: PETER FRANCIS BERK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&S 3 Holdings LLC
Represented By: PETER FRANCIS BERK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDEN MOTOR FREIGHT CO.
Represented By: PETER FRANCIS BERK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&S Leasing Holding Company LLC
Represented By: PETER FRANCIS BERK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&S LEASING CO. II LLC
Represented By: PETER FRANCIS BERK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ODYSSEY LOGISTICS & TECHNOLOGY CORP.
Represented By: PETER FRANCIS BERK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&S LEASING CO., L.L.C
Represented By: PETER FRANCIS BERK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDEN TRANSPORTATION INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: PETER FRANCIS BERK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LBT INTERMODAL LLC
Represented By: PETER FRANCIS BERK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN/JANE DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPS. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linden Bulk Transportation Co., Inc.
Represented By: PETER FRANCIS BERK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WERNY CASTRO
Represented By: ANTHONY SANTOS ALMEIDA
Represented By: RAVI SATTIRAJU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?