WEST v. MONMOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, INC. et al
Plaintiff: SHAKIA WEST
Defendant: MONMOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, INC., MONMOUTH MEDICAL CENTER SOUTHERN CAMPUS, ERIN LANGFORD, NBI CHILDREN HOSPITAL - MONMOUTH FACULTY PRACTICE, JOHN/JANE DOES #1-10, MMC PROVIDER SERVICES, MONMOUTH MEDICAL CENTER SOUTHERN CAMPUS BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, ABC CORPS. #1-10, RWJ BARNABAS HEALTH, INC. d/b/a MONMOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ("RWJ"), NEW MMC, MMC and JULIET M. GOSSETT
Case Number: 2:2019cv20459
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Edward S Kiel
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference scheduled for January 13, 2020 is adjourned to January 16, 2020 at 10 AM. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 1/12/2020. (as, )
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LETTER ORDER: An in-person initial scheduling conference shall be held on 1/13/2020 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 8 of the U.S. Post Office and Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The parties shall submit a proposed Joint Discovery Plan as a Word document, to ESK_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Courts form Joint Discovery Plan may be found at www.njd.uscourts.gov/content/edward-s-kiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 12/9/2019. (as, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by JULIET M. GOSSETT, ERIN LANGFORD, MONMOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, INC., RWJ BARNABAS HEALTH, INC. d/b/a MONMOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ("RWJ").(BLUNDA, MARK)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RWJ BARNABAS HEALTH, INC. d/b/a MONMOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ("RWJ") identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (PATEL, NEHA)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MONMOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, INC. identifying RWJBarnabas Health, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (PATEL, NEHA)
November 22, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #2 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by JULIET M. GOSSETT, RWJ BARNABAS HEALTH, INC. d/b/a MONMOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ("RWJ"), ERIN LANGFORD, MONMOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/9/2019. (ld, )
November 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (ak, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants RWJBarnabas Health, Inc, Monmouth Medical Center, Erin Langford, & Juliet Gossett. Attorney NEHA PATEL for JULIET M. GOSSETT,NEHA PATEL for ERIN LANGFORD,NEHA PATEL for MONMOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, INC.,NEHA PATEL for RWJ BARNABAS HEALTH, INC. d/b/a MONMOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, INC. (RWJ) added. (PATEL, NEHA)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JULIET M. GOSSETT, RWJ BARNABAS HEALTH, INC. d/b/a MONMOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ("RWJ"), ERIN LANGFORD, MONMOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Essex County, case number ESX-L-007722-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10119691), filed by JULIET M. GOSSETT, RWJ BARNABAS HEALTH, INC. d/b/a MONMOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ("RWJ"), ERIN LANGFORD, MONMOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Superior Court of Removal, #2 Cover Letter)(BLUNDA, MARK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WEST v. MONMOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONMOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: NEHA PATEL
Represented By: MARK J. BLUNDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONMOUTH MEDICAL CENTER SOUTHERN CAMPUS
Represented By: NEHA PATEL
Represented By: MARK J. BLUNDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIN LANGFORD
Represented By: NEHA PATEL
Represented By: MARK J. BLUNDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBI CHILDREN HOSPITAL - MONMOUTH FACULTY PRACTICE
Represented By: NEHA PATEL
Represented By: MARK J. BLUNDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN/JANE DOES #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MMC PROVIDER SERVICES
Represented By: NEHA PATEL
Represented By: MARK J. BLUNDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONMOUTH MEDICAL CENTER SOUTHERN CAMPUS BEHAVIORAL HEALTH
Represented By: NEHA PATEL
Represented By: MARK J. BLUNDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPS. #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RWJ BARNABAS HEALTH, INC. d/b/a MONMOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ("RWJ")
Represented By: NEHA PATEL
Represented By: MARK J. BLUNDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW MMC
Represented By: NEHA PATEL
Represented By: MARK J. BLUNDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MMC
Represented By: NEHA PATEL
Represented By: MARK J. BLUNDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIET M. GOSSETT
Represented By: NEHA PATEL
Represented By: MARK J. BLUNDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAKIA WEST
Represented By: JOSEPH J. BELL, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?