HOLLINS v. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: DOUGLAS HOLLINS, JR.
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., BANC OF AMERICA MORTGAGE SECURITIES, INC., MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC., WELLS FARGO BANK N.A. AS TRUSTEE FOR SECURITIZED TRUST BANK OF AMERICA MORTGAGE 2007-4 TRUST, BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC., DOES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE ET AL., WELLS FARGO BANK and BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. BANC OF AMERICA MORTGAGE SECURITIES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv20532
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 Joint Proposed Discovery Plan from Douglas Hollings Jr.. (sm)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LETTER ORDER: The Court shall enter a scheduling order setting forth dates for discovery. The parties shall file a proposed discovery plan by 3:00 p.m. on 1/23/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/13/2019. (jqb, )
December 10, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. Motion set for 1/21/2020 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. BANC OF AMERICA MORTGAGE SECURITIES, INC., BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC., WELLS FARGO BANK. Responses due by 1/7/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration Declaration of M. Blaine, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #11 Certificate of Service Cert of Service)(BLAINE, MICHAEL)
November 26, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC., BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. BANC OF AMERICA MORTGAGE SECURITIES, INC., BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., WELLS FARGO BANK has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/11/2019. (th, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to all Defendants.. (BLAINE, MICHAEL)
November 20, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WELLS FARGO BANK N.A. AS TRUSTEE FOR SECURITIZED TRUST BANK OF AMERICA MORTGAGE 2007-4 TRUST identifying Wells Fargo & Company as Corporate Parent.. (BLAINE, MICHAEL)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC. identifying MERSCORP Holdings Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (BLAINE, MICHAEL)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BANC OF AMERICA MORTGAGE SECURITIES, INC. identifying Bank of America, N.A. as Corporate Parent.. (BLAINE, MICHAEL)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. identifying Bank of America, N.A. as Corporate Parent.. (BLAINE, MICHAEL)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC., BANC OF AMERICA MORTGAGE SECURITIES, INC., BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., WELLS FARGO BANK N.A. AS TRUSTEE FOR SECURITIZED TRUST BANK OF AMERICA MORTGAGE 2007-4 TRUST from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY ESSEX COUNTY, case number ESX L 07612 19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10125189), filed by MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC., BANC OF AMERICA MORTGAGE SECURITIES, INC., BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., WELLS FARGO BANK N.A. AS TRUSTEE FOR SECURITIZED TRUST BANK OF AMERICA MORTGAGE 2007-4 TRUST. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(BLAINE, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOLLINS v. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Represented By: MICHAEL E. BLAINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANC OF AMERICA MORTGAGE SECURITIES, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL E. BLAINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL E. BLAINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK N.A. AS TRUSTEE FOR SECURITIZED TRUST BANK OF AMERICA MORTGAGE 2007-4 TRUST
Represented By: MICHAEL E. BLAINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL E. BLAINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE ET AL.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK
Represented By: MICHAEL E. BLAINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. BANC OF AMERICA MORTGAGE SECURITIES, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL E. BLAINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOUGLAS HOLLINS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?